AMES v. BUSACR et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL E. AMES
Defendant: JOHN BUSACR, ADAM DE BOTH, ANDREW DENSFORD, IVAN SHULTZ, III, ZACHARY TINGLE, RYAN J SALISBURY, BERNARD SIMS, KELLY D. HIBBS, JENNIFER VAN VACTER and JACQUELINE RECARTE
Case Number: 1:2021cv02842
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with court orders. Show Cause Response due by 2/7/2022. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 1/6/2022 Copy sent to Mr. Ames via US Mail (CBU)
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #2 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction sent to MICHAEL E. AMES. (Return to Sender Not Deliverable As Addressed Unable to Forward) (CKM)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #2 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction sent to MICHAEL E. AMES. (Return to Sender Not Deliverable As Addressed Unable to Forward) (CKM)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; In his complaint, Mr. Ames indicated that he wishes to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915. A prisoner seeking to proceed in forma pauperis is also required by statute to submit a copy of his prison account statement "for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. The plaintiff shall have through December 27, 2021, in which to either pay the $402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that he lacks the financial ability to do so by completing and signing the attached affidavit form and submitting a certified prison account statement for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action on November 10, 2021. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/15/2021. Copies Mailed.(CKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMES v. BUSACR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL E. AMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BUSACR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM DE BOTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW DENSFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAN SHULTZ, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARY TINGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN J SALISBURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARD SIMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY D. HIBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER VAN VACTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELINE RECARTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?