STREET v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: Dionna Street
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS and COOK MEDICAL LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02964
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
3 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MED INSTITUTE INC., MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02964-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06630-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06668-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06674-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06677-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06678-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06679-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06684-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06687-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06688-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06689-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06695-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MED INSTITUTE INC., MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02964-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06630-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06668-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06674-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06677-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06678-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06679-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06684-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06687-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06688-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06689-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06695-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
December 13, 2021 Filing 7 Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:21-cv-02955-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02956-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02958-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02960-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02962-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02963-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02964-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL2570 on 12/13/2021. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02955-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02956-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02958-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02960-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02962-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02963-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02964-RLY-TAB (LBT)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/13/2021.(LBT)
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LMK)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge James R. Sweeney II, Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-02964-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (LMK)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Curt Tanner on behalf of Plaintiff Dionna Street. (Tanner, J.)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon C. Conlin on behalf of Plaintiff Dionna Street. (Conlin, Jon)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6868403) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STREET v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionna Street
Represented By: J. Curt Tanner
Represented By: Jon C. Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?