BLAND v. HEYMIG
Plaintiff: DAVID T. BLAND
Defendant: T. HEYMIG
Case Number: 1:2021cv03042
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through February 28, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by DAVID T. BLAND. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US Mail. (TMC)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00946. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/15/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 12/15/2021.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against T Heymig, filed by David T Bland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(No filing fee or IFP received)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Bland)(kms) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 12/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLAND v. HEYMIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID T. BLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. HEYMIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?