GRAHAM v. BOREK
Plaintiff: BRYANT L. GRAHAM
Defendant: ROSEMARY L. BOREK
Case Number: 1:2021cv03124
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Meet Judge, filed by Plaintiff BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AAS)
January 21, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Set Aside - Vacate, filed by Plaintiff BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (AAS)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY GRANTING IFP #2 AND SCREENING COMPLAINT - Plaintiff Bryant Graham's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Filing No. #2 is GRANTED. While in forma pauperis status allows the plaintiff to proceed without pre-payment of the filing fee, the plaintiff remains liable for the full fees. Because Graham has not carried his burden of demonstrating that this court has jurisdiction his case must be DISMISSED without prejudice. SEE ORDER. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/12/2022. (AAS)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (AAS)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (DJH)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROSEMARY L. BOREK, filed by BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (No fee paid with this filing) (DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAHAM v. BOREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYANT L. GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEMARY L. BOREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?