GUISASOLA v. COOK INCCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: ERNESTO GUISASOLA
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2021cv06607
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02944-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02621-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02635-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02643-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02646-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06606-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06607-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06608-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06609-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06610-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06612-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06617-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06618-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
November 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02944-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02621-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02635-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02643-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02646-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06606-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06607-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06608-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06609-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06610-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06612-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06617-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06618-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Stoller on behalf of Plaintiff ERNESTO GUISASOLA, MDL Plaintiff ERNESTO GUISASOLA. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06607-RLY-TAB (Stoller, Paul)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ERNESTO GUISASOLA.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06607-RLY-TAB(Stoller, Paul)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 Remark Case Transferred In from Northern District of Alabama, Cause No. 2:21-cv-1174 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6606-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Florida, Cause No. 0:21-cv-61787 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6607-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Georgia, Cause No. 1:21-cv-129 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6608-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Kentucky, Cause No. 3:21-cv-529 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6609-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Middle District of Louisiana, Cause No. 3:21-cv-501 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6610-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Maryland, Cause No. 1:21-cv-2011 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6611-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Michigan, Cause No. 2:21-cv-11906 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6612-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Michigan, Cause No. 2:21-cv-12029 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6613-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06606-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06607-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06608-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06609-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06610-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06611-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06612-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06613-RLY-TAB(LBT)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/4/2021.(LBT)
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:21-cv-61787. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-166) transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana re: MDL 2570 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Richard L. Young. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/30/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case based on the conditional transfer order filed by the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (mcy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/30/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ernesto Guisasola. Cook Medical LLC served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Sanders, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/30/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ernesto Guisasola. Cook Medical Incorporated served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Sanders, Daniel)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/30/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ernesto Guisasola. Cook Incorporated served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Sanders, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/30/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ernesto Guisasola. Cook Group Incorporated served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Sanders, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/30/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/30/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. Modified text on 8/25/2021 (mee). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/30/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14955456, filed by Ernesto Guisasola. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Sanders, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/30/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUISASOLA v. COOK INCCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNESTO GUISASOLA
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Paul L. Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?