TAYLOR v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. TAYLOR, JR.
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2021cv06614
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 18 MARGINAL ENTRY - (20304) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in case 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB APPROVED. Case (1:21-cv-6614) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/15/2021. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06614-RLY-TAB(LBT)
November 1, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by MDL Plaintiff ROBERT TAYLOR. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06614-RLY-TAB (Stoller, Paul)
October 25, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Stoller on behalf of Plaintiff ROBERT TAYLOR, MDL Plaintiff ROBERT TAYLOR. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06614-RLY-TAB (Stoller, Paul)
October 25, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ROBERT TAYLOR.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06614-RLY-TAB(Stoller, Paul)
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 Remark - Case Transferred In from Northern District of Mississippi, Cause No. 1:21-cv-138 on 10/4/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6614-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of New York, Cause No. 6:21-cv-6593 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6615-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Oklahoma, Cause No. 4:21-cv-366 on 10/1/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6616-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Middle District of Pennsylvania, Cause No. 4:21-cv-1524 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6617-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of South Carolina, Cause No. 2:21-cv-2810 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6618-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Virginia, Cause No. 3:21-cv-543 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6619-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of West Virginia, Cause No. 3:21-cv-437 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6620-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06614-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06615-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06616-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06617-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06618-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06619-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06620-RLY-TAB(LBT)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/4/2021.(LBT)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00138. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case Transferred to Southern District of Indiana. Case file sent electronically. CASE CLOSED. (jtm) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Shelton on behalf of Robert J. Taylor, Jr Cook Medical, LLC served on 9/9/2021. (Shelton, David) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Shelton on behalf of Robert J. Taylor, Jr Cook Medical Incorporated served on 9/9/2021. (Shelton, David) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Shelton on behalf of Robert J. Taylor, Jr Cook Incorporated served on 9/9/2021. (Shelton, David) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Shelton on behalf of Robert J. Taylor, Jr Cook Group Incorporated served on 9/9/2021. (Shelton, David) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 23, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 Acknowledgment of Service, #6 Acknowledgment of Service, #4 Acknowledgment of Service, #5 Acknowledgment of Service: Attorney to refile each document using civil event "Summons Returned Executed". (jwr) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Robert J. Taylor, Jr. (Shelton, David) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Robert J. Taylor, Jr. (Shelton, David) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Robert J. Taylor, Jr. (Shelton, David) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Robert J. Taylor, Jr. (Shelton, David) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1994444, filed by Robert J. Taylor, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]
September 2, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/4/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. TAYLOR, JR.
Represented By: David W. Shelton
Represented By: Paul L. Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?