GARNER v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: GEORGE R. GARNER
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2021cv06616
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02384-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02577-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02597-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02608-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02618-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06611-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06613-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06615-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06616-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06619-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06620-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06634-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06637-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06641-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
October 29, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02384-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02577-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02597-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02608-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02618-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06611-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06613-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06615-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06616-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06619-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06620-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06634-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06637-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06641-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
October 25, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Stoller on behalf of Plaintiff GEORGE GARNER, MDL Plaintiff GEORGE GARNER. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06616-RLY-TAB (Stoller, Paul)
October 25, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GEORGE GARNER.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06616-RLY-TAB(Stoller, Paul)
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 Remark - Case Transferred In from Northern District of Mississippi, Cause No. 1:21-cv-138 on 10/4/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6614-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of New York, Cause No. 6:21-cv-6593 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6615-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Oklahoma, Cause No. 4:21-cv-366 on 10/1/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6616-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Middle District of Pennsylvania, Cause No. 4:21-cv-1524 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6617-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of South Carolina, Cause No. 2:21-cv-2810 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6618-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Virginia, Cause No. 3:21-cv-543 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6619-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of West Virginia, Cause No. 3:21-cv-437 on 9/30/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6620-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06614-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06615-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06616-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06617-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06618-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06619-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06620-RLY-TAB(LBT)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/4/2021.(LBT)
October 1, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00366. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 30, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #11 ) (srt, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the MDL Panel, transferring case (terminates case) (lmt, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 ***Remark: Received Minute Order from MDL re: transferee clerk to transmit a certified copy of the Panel Order to transfer to the district court from which the action is being transferred (lmt, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 ***Remark: Received Conditional Transfer Order from MDL re: stay is lifted (lmt, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Cook Medical, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by George R Garner (Rust, Andrea) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Cook Medical Incorporated (Re: #2 Complaint ) by George R Garner (Rust, Andrea) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Cook Group Incorporated (Re: #2 Complaint ) by George R Garner (Rust, Andrea) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Cook Incorporated (Re: #2 Complaint ) by George R Garner (Rust, Andrea) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrea Rae Rust on behalf of George R Garner (Rust, Andrea) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2472264) by George R Garner (Rust, Andrea) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by George R Garner (Rust, Andrea) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 10/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARNER v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE R. GARNER
Represented By: Andrea Rae Rust
Represented By: Paul L. Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?