SHELLEY v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: ROY SHELLEY
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED and COOK MEDICAL LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv06630
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-00788. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ROY SHELLEY as to All Defendants. Service made 9/20/21, answer due 10/11/21. (Longer, Frederick) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/20/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC (Main Document: Summons; Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (cww) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/20/2021.]
September 16, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: Document should have been filed as four separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate attachments within the same event. Clerk of Court to issue summons. This message is for informational purposes only. (cww) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/20/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ROY SHELLEY (Longer, Frederick) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/20/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/20/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 6/16/21. (jg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/20/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/20/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6566235), filed by Roy Shelley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cww) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 10/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHELLEY v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY SHELLEY
Represented By: Frederick S. Longer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?