BRANDON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: RALPH W. BRANDON
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2021cv06660
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06519-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06643-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06644-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06646-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06647-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06650-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06651-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06659-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06661-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06662-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06663-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06664-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06665-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06666-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06675-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
December 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, MED INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06519-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06643-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06644-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06646-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06647-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06648-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06649-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06650-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06651-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06659-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06661-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06662-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06663-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06664-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06665-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06666-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06675-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Stoller on behalf of MDL Plaintiff RALPH W. BRANDON. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB (Stoller, Paul)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RALPH W. BRANDON.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB(Stoller, Paul)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 Remark - Case Transferred In from Middle District of Florida, Cause No. 2:21-cv-755 on 11/4/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6659-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Florida, Cause No. 5:21-cv-201 on 11/3/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6660-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06659-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06660-RLY-TAB (LBT)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/4/2021.(LBT)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 5:21-cv-00201. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-172) re MDL 2570 to Southern District of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Email Request) (jcw) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/3/2021.]
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RALPH W BRANDON. COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (SANDERS, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/3/2021.]
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RALPH W BRANDON. COOK GROUP INCORPORATED served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (SANDERS, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/3/2021.]
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RALPH W BRANDON. COOK MEDICAL LLC served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (SANDERS, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/3/2021.]
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RALPH W BRANDON. COOK INCORPORATED served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (SANDERS, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/3/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jcw) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/3/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6439381.), filed by Ralph Brandon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Supplement Summons, #5 Supplement Summons) (SANDERS, DANIEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRANDON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALPH W. BRANDON
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sanders
Represented By: Paul L. Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?