MURPHY v. COOK INCOPORATED et al
Plaintiff: TONY MURPHY
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2021cv06682
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MED INSTITUTE INC., MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02964-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06630-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06668-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06674-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06677-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06678-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06679-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06684-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06687-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06688-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06689-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06695-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MED INSTITUTE INC., MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02964-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06630-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06668-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06674-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06677-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06678-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06679-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06684-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06687-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06688-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06689-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06695-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff TONY MURPHY. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TONY MURPHY.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer)
December 3, 2021 Filing 8 Remark - Case Transferred In from Northern District of Florida, Cause No. 4:21-cv-354 on 12/3/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6681-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Michigan, Cause No. 2:21-cv-12629 on 12/1/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6682-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Missouri, Cause No. 6:21-cv-3294 on 12/1/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6683-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of New Hampshire, Cause No. 1:21-cv-914 on 12/3/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6684-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of New Hampshire, Cause No. 1:21-cv-915 on 12/2/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6685-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Cause No. 2:21-cv-3600 on 12/2/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6686-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Vermont, Cause No. 5:21-cv-269 on 12/1/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6687-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Washington, Cause No. 3:21-cv-5837 on 12/1/2021,assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6688-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06681-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06683-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06684-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06685-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06686-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06687-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06688-RLY-TAB (LBT)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/3/2021.(LBT)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-12629. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Transfer to the Southern District of Indiana for MDL 2570 (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 12/1/2021.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-178) to Southern District of Indiana for MDL # 2570. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 12/1/2021.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-178) for MDL # 2570. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 12/1/2021.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 12/1/2021.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tony Murphy against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8683834 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court Southern District of Indiana, 14-ml-2570; MDL2570, Judge Richard L. Young] (Thompson, Jason) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 12/1/2021.]
November 9, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 12/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURPHY v. COOK INCOPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY MURPHY
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?