NEWSON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: YOLANDA NEWSON
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2021cv06686
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02963-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-03048-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-03121-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-03122-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-03123-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06456-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06487-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06516-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06518-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06539-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06686-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00014-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00015-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00023-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06697-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06698-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02963-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-03048-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-03121-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-03122-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-03123-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06456-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06487-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06516-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06518-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06539-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06686-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00014-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00015-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00023-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06697-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06698-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 Submission Amended Complaint Against All Defendants, filed by YOLANDA NEWSON. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06686-RLY-TAB(Goss, Peter)
December 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Goss on behalf of Plaintiff YOLANDA NEWSON, MDL Plaintiff YOLANDA NEWSON. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06686-RLY-TAB (Goss, Peter)
December 3, 2021 Filing 7 Remark - Case Transferred In from Northern District of Florida, Cause No. 4:21-cv-354 on 12/3/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6681-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Michigan, Cause No. 2:21-cv-12629 on 12/1/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6682-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Missouri, Cause No. 6:21-cv-3294 on 12/1/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6683-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of New Hampshire, Cause No. 1:21-cv-914 on 12/3/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6684-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of New Hampshire, Cause No. 1:21-cv-915 on 12/2/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6685-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Cause No. 2:21-cv-3600 on 12/2/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6686-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Vermont, Cause No. 5:21-cv-269 on 12/1/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6687-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Washington, Cause No. 3:21-cv-5837 on 12/1/2021,assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6688-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06681-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06683-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06684-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06685-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06686-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06687-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06688-RLY-TAB (LBT)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/3/2021.(LBT)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-03600. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 2, 2021 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-178). Re: Order that, pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the actions on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 USC sec. 1407 to the Southern District of Indiana for the reasons stated in the Order of 10/15/14, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Hon. Richard L. Young. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/2/2021.]
November 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Forwarded To: Michael M. Weinkowitz on 11/9/21 (fdc, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/2/2021.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 Issuance of Summonses Cook Group Inc., Cook Inc., Cook Medical Inc., Cook Medical LLC by Yolanda Newson. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/2/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT TEN (10) DAYS PRIOR TO ANY MOTION BEING FILED, COUNSEL MUST NOTIFY OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE POTENTIAL MOTION, AND THE POSSIBLE RESOLUTION OF SAME, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/16/21. 8/16/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/2/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Summons Issued as to COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/13/21 (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/2/2021.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15334403.), filed by Yolanda Newson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/2/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEWSON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOLANDA NEWSON
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Represented By: Peter E. Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?