NORTHERN v. PORTER COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: SHEDRICK NORTHERN
Defendant: PORTER COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, LATESHA MILLER, PORTER COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE and GARY GERMANN
Case Number: 1:2022cv00323
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 The Southern District of Indiana receives e-mail notice from the Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana regarding electronic case transfer. This case was received electronically by the Northern District of Indiana on 2/23/2022 and was assigned case number 2:22-cv-00041. (AKH)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on February 22, 2022. (AKH)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION/CLOSED TRANSFER to the Northern District of Indiana, Hammond Division. Pro se Plaintiff Shedrick Northern filed a Complaint on February 14, 2021 (Dkt. No. #1 ). While the caption of Plaintiff's Complaint notes the "United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana," his Complaint explains that he is located in Valparaiso, Indiana, and he is suing based on events that occurred in the Valparaiso area, which is in the Northern District of Indiana. It appears that the named defendants are located in the Northern District of Indiana, and one defendant is located in Chicago. It is apparent that this action was incorrectly filed in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana and should have been filed in the Northern District of Indiana. The Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, Hammond Division. Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/22/2022. (AKH)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by SHEDRICK NORTHERN. (AKH)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, SHEDRICK NORTHERN. (DJH)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GARY GERMANN, LATESHA MILLER, PORTER COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, and PORTER COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, filed by SHEDRICK NORTHERN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits -- Porter County Order of Protection Case, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 proposed USM-285 form to Latesha Miller, #5 proposed USM-285 form to Porter County Clerk's Office, #6 proposed USM-285 form to Porter County Prosecutor Office, #7 proposed USM-285 form to Porter County Sheriff's Department)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORTHERN v. PORTER COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEDRICK NORTHERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTER COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATESHA MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTER COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY GERMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?