MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE et al v. LEAS CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE and INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Defendant: LEAS CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00353
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 CLOSED DISMISSED/MARGINAL ENTRY - regarding #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice. ACKNOWLEDGED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/10/2022.(AKH)
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE. (Schwartz, Donald)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LEAS CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC. (AKH)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE. (Schwartz, Donald)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEAS CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC, filed by MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6977628) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Memorandum of Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE et al v. LEAS CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAS CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?