SMITH v. ELLIOTT et al
Plaintiff: DEONTE' SMITH
Defendant: DANIEL ELLIOTT, RYAN BOWERSOX, WILLIAM MCINERNEY, LUCY FRICK, EMILY CHASTAIN and LAURA PITTS
Case Number: 1:2022cv00375
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENTRY GRANTING CLARIFICATION - This matter is before the Court on pro se Plaintiff's letter docketed as a Motion for Clarification (Dkt. #10 ). Plaintiff asks if his "forma pauperis" was accepted, and if so, "where am I in regards to my screening process." Plaintiff also states that he would like to amend his Complaint. The Motion is GRANTED to the extent the Court provides the following clarification. In forma pauperis status has been granted, the original complaint has been screened, and Plaintiff has until Friday May 13, 2022 to file an amended complaint. See Dkt. #9 . The clerk is directed to provide the Plaintiff with a copy of the docket sheet for this case and a copy of the order at Dkt. #9 . Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Public Docket Sheet) (AKH)
April 18, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Case Status, filed by Plaintiff DEONTE' SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY GRANTING #4 and #6 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - This matter is before the Court on pro se Plaintiff Deonte' Smith's Requests to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Full Filing Fee (Filing No. #4 ; Filing No. #6 ). Because he is allowed to proceed in forma pauperis, this action is also subject to screening. The filing fee for in forma pauperis litigants is $350.00. No payment is due currently; however, the $350.00 balance remains owing. Smith's Requests to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Full Filing Fee (Filing No. #4 ; Filing No. #6 ) are GRANTED. Having screened the Complaint, the Court finds it is subject to dismissal for lack of jurisdiction. Smith is granted leave to file an amended complaint by no later than Friday, May 13, 2022. If no amended complaint is filed by that date, this action will be dismissed for the reasons set forth above. Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/13/2022. (AKH)
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (AKH)
March 18, 2022 Filing 7 Submission of Trust Account Statement, filed by Plaintiff DEONTE' SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH)
March 11, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DEONTE' SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH)
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by DEONTE' SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DEONTE' SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER ACTION - Pro se Plaintiff Deonte' Smith filed a Complaint on February 22, 2022 (Dkt. #1 ). Plaintiff failed to pay the filing fee or alternatively file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $402.00 filing fee to the clerk of the district court or submit the necessary motion to proceed in forma pauperis (and printout of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this request) no later than March 31, 2022, or this action will be dismissed and final judgment entered without further notice. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of the form "Prisoner Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Full Filing Fee" to Plaintiff with this Order. Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Blank Form: Prisoner Request to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying the Full Filing Fee) (AKH)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RYAN BOWERSOX, EMILY CHASTAIN, DANIEL ELLIOTT, LUCY FRICK, WILLIAM MCINERNEY, and LAURA PITTS, filed by DEONTE' SMITH. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. ELLIOTT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEONTE' SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL ELLIOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN BOWERSOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM MCINERNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCY FRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY CHASTAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA PITTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?