INDIANA UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF TURNING POINT USA et al v. CITY OF BLOOMINGTON, INDIANA et al
Plaintiff: INDIANA UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF TURNING POINT USA and KYLE REYNOLDS
Defendant: CITY OF BLOOMINGTON, INDIANA, ADAM WASON, KYLA COX DECKARD, BETH H. HOLLINGSWORTH and DANA HENKE
Case Number: 1:2022cv00458
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #19 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to May 11, 2022 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/22/2022. (SWM)
April 21, 2022 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to May 11, 2022 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs INDIANA UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF TURNING POINT USA, KYLE REYNOLDS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Reply Brief)(Bock, William)
April 11, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Defendants CITY OF BLOOMINGTON, INDIANA, KYLA COX DECKARD, DANA HENKE, BETH H. HOLLINGSWORTH, ADAM WASON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 100 - Resolution 20-06 (May 1, 2020), #2 Exhibit 101 - BCCAC Minutes September 21, 2020, #3 Exhibit 102 - Parks Department July 28, 2020 Staff Report, #4 Exhibit 103 - BCCAC Proposal, #5 Exhibit 104 - Parks Department July 28, 2020 Minutes, #6 Exhibit 105 - Resolution 20-16 (September 23, 2020), #7 Exhibit 106 - Board of Works Minutes Sept. 29, 2020, #8 Exhibit 107 - Board of Works Resolution 2020-50 (September 29, 2020), #9 Exhibit 108 - Board of Works Staff Report (April 13,2021), #10 Exhibit 109 - Board of Works Minutes April 13, 2021, #11 Exhibit 110 - Board of Works Resolution 2021-10 (September 13, 2021), #12 Exhibit 111 - Board of Works Staff Report (August 3, 2021), #13 Exhibit 112 - Board of Works Minutes (August 3, 2021), #14 Affidavit of Adam Wason, #15 Affidavit of Erik Pearson, #16 Exhibit 116 - Press Release November 13, 2020 Dedication Ceremony for Elm Street Black Lives Matter Mural, #17 Exhibit 117 - Press Release December 1, 2020 Second Black Lives Matter Street Mural Scheduled for Installation, #18 Exhibit 118 - Press Release April 14, 2021 City's Second Black Lives Matter Mural to be Installed on Downtown Square, #19 Exhibit 119 - BCCAC Minutes August 17, 2020, #20 Exhibit 120 - BCCAC Minutes April 20, 2021, #21 Exhibit 121 - BCCAC Minutes November 16, 2020, #22 Exhibit 122 - BCCAC Minutes October 19, 2020, #23 Exhibit 123 - BCCAC Minutes Septemer 21, 2020)(Roberts, Liberty)
April 11, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses, filed by All Defendants.(Roberts, Liberty)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to April 25, 2022 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction -Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/30/2022. (SWM) Modified on 3/30/2022 (SWM).
March 29, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to April 25, 2022 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs INDIANA UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF TURNING POINT USA, KYLE REYNOLDS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time)(Bock, William)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON MARCH 16, 2022, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - The parties appeared by counsel March 16, 2022, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regarding case status, settlement, and related matters. Defendants shall file an answer and response to Plaintiffs' pending motion for preliminary injunction by April 11, 2022. Plaintiffs shall file any reply brief by April 18, 2022. At this time, it does not appear that an evidentiary hearing will be needed to resolve this motion, and neither side has requested oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/16/2022 11:00 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall appear by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The purpose of this conference is to address case status and settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/11/2022.(SWM)
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance with Local Rule 81-2, filed by Plaintiffs INDIANA UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF TURNING POINT USA, KYLE REYNOLDS, re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #7 Appendix. (Bock, William)
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 APPENDIX re #6 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction Appendix of Exhibits by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1A - 8.2.21 Email, #2 Ex. 1B - 7.20.21 - 8.3.21 Emails, #3 Ex. 1C - 7.29.21 - 8.1.21 Emails, #4 Ex. 1D - 8.2.21 - 8.10.21 Emails, #5 Ex. 1E - 8.10.21 - 8.23.21 Emails, #6 Ex. 1F - Final Proof mural, #7 Ex. 2A - Excerpts BPW Meeting 9.29.20, #8 Ex. 2B - Excerpts BPW Meeting 4.13.21, #9 Ex. 2C - Excerpts BPW Meeting 8.3.21, #10 Ex. 2D - BPW Minutes 8.3.21, #11 Ex. 2E - Excerpts BPW 9.14.21, #12 Ex. 3A - Article 7.6.21, #13 Ex. 3B - Article 8.31.21, #14 Ex. 3C - B Square Bulletin 8.1.21, #15 Ex. 3D - Article 7.13.21, #16 Ex. 3E - Black Collegians Facebook Post 7.2.21, #17 Ex. 3F - IU Tweet 7.8.21, #18 Ex. 3G - IU Provost Tweet 7.6.21, #19 Ex. 4A - B Square Bulletin 6.27.20, #20 Ex. 4B - Middle Way House Display, #21 Ex. 4C - beINvolved Wrapped in Love Events, #22 Ex. 4D - IU Parade Guide, #23 Ex. 5 - TPUSA Constitution, #24 Ex. 6 - Kyle Reynolds Declaration, #25 Ex. 7 - Mary Myers Declaration)(Bock, William)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs INDIANA UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF TURNING POINT USA, KYLE REYNOLDS. (Bock, William)
March 10, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiffs INDIANA UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF TURNING POINT USA, KYLE REYNOLDS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bock, William)
March 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bock, III on behalf of Plaintiffs INDIANA UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF TURNING POINT USA, KYLE REYNOLDS. (Bock, William)
March 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pending State Court Motions, filed by Defendants CITY OF BLOOMINGTON, INDIANA, KYLA COX DECKARD, DANA HENKE, BETH H. HOLLINGSWORTH, ADAM WASON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pending State Court Motion - Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Roberts, Liberty)
March 9, 2022 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (CKM)
March 9, 2022 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (CKM)
March 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Liberty L. Roberts on behalf of Defendants CITY OF BLOOMINGTON, INDIANA, KYLA COX DECKARD, DANA HENKE, BETH H. HOLLINGSWORTH, ADAM WASON. (Roberts, Liberty)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County Circuit Court, case number 53C01-2202-PL-000361, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7004605) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, Appearances, Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiff's Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Summonses, Affidavits of Service of Summonses, Order of Disqualification, Order Transferring Case and Notice to Clerk, #2 State Court Record State Court's Operative Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Liberty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INDIANA UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF TURNING POINT USA et al v. CITY OF BLOOMINGTON, INDIANA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF TURNING POINT USA
Represented By: William Bock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE REYNOLDS
Represented By: William Bock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF BLOOMINGTON, INDIANA
Represented By: Liberty L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM WASON
Represented By: Liberty L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLA COX DECKARD
Represented By: Liberty L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETH H. HOLLINGSWORTH
Represented By: Liberty L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA HENKE
Represented By: Liberty L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?