MCCLESKEY et al v. PRICE CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS and MARK MCCLESKEY
Defendant: PRICE CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00687
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MARK MCCLESKEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Donald)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The Defendant's Answer to the Complaint filed by Nakia Price cannot be considered an Answer (Dkt. #6 ). The Price Construction Group, LLC cannot represent itself. As an entity and not a human being, it may only defend a case through an attorney. If Defendant's registered agent, Nakia Price, is an attorney registered to practice law in the Southern District of Indiana, an Appearance must be filed. If Nakia Price is not an attorney, the Defendant must secure an attorney in order to defend this action. The Court ORDERS Price Construction Group, LLC to appear by counsel and to show cause, in writing, by May 31, 2022, why the Answer filed on May 5, 2022 should not be stricken. Defendant is notified that failure to respond to this show cause order may result in an entry of default being entered. Show Cause Response due by 5/31/2022. Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/10/2022.(AKH)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by PRICE CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Answer)(AKH)
April 22, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by MARK MCCLESKEY, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. PRICE CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC served on 4/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Schwartz, Donald)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JSR)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PRICE CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC. (JSR)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE. (Schwartz, Donald)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRICE CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC, filed by MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7045625) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCLESKEY et al v. PRICE CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRICE CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?