STATE OF INDIANA v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: STATE OF INDIANA
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, Unknown Owner and Any Heirs, Devisees, Legatees, Successors, Assigns, Executors, Trustees, Receivers, Agents and Representatives and All Other Unknown Persons or Entities Claiming An Interest in the R, INDIANA DELAWARE COUNTY, UNKNOWN OWNER AND ANY HEIRS, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, SUCCESSORS, ASSIGNS, EXECUTORS, TRUSTEES, RECEIVERS, AGENTS AND REPRESENTATIVES, AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS OR ENTITIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE and DELAWARE COUNTY INDIANA
Case Number: 1:2022cv01090
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Proceedings , filed by Defendant NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Loftus, Barry)
June 29, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Domonic Sean Dreyer hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Dreyer, Domonic)
June 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Proceedings, filed by Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreyer, Domonic)
June 24, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Domonic Sean Dreyer on behalf of Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA. (Dreyer, Domonic)
June 24, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Michelle Lynn Kossmann hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Kossmann, Michelle)
June 1, 2022 Filing 8 Submission of State Court Record from Delaware County in Case Number 18C03-2204-PL-000037. (Attachments: #1 Envelope and insert)(DJH)
June 1, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(Loftus, Barry)
June 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scotty N. Teal on behalf of Defendant NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Teal, Scotty)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court and Notice of Removal)(Loftus, Barry)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Loftus, Barry)
May 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry L. Loftus on behalf of Defendant NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Loftus, Barry)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delaware Circuit, case number 18C03-2204-PL-37, filed by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7121563) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Appearances, Complaint, Lis Pendens Notice, Summons, Motion for Extension of Time and Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loftus, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF INDIANA v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Domonic Sean Dreyer
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Kossmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Barry L. Loftus
Represented By: Scotty N. Teal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owner and Any Heirs, Devisees, Legatees, Successors, Assigns, Executors, Trustees, Receivers, Agents and Representatives and All Other Unknown Persons or Entities Claiming An Interest in the R
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DELAWARE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OWNER AND ANY HEIRS, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, SUCCESSORS, ASSIGNS, EXECUTORS, TRUSTEES, RECEIVERS, AGENTS AND REPRESENTATIVES, AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS OR ENTITIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE COUNTY INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?