WALTERS v. NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC.
Plaintiff: JEFFERY WALTERS
Defendant: NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01780
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by JEFFERY WALTERS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form) (Draher, Shannon)
October 27, 2022 Filing 21 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Defendant's Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Collective Action Complaint), filed by NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC..(DeCamp, Paul)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2022 03:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/18/2022.(SWM)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Brenna Rose McLean for NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/12/2022. (SWM)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kathleen Barrett for NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/12/2022. (SWM)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Paul DeCamp for NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/12/2022. (SWM)
October 7, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robi J. Baishnab on behalf of Plaintiff JEFFERY WALTERS. (Baishnab, Robi)
October 6, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC.. (DeCamp, Paul)
October 6, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC..(DeCamp, Paul)
October 5, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brenna R. McLean to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7311896), filed by Defendant NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC.. (McLean, Brenna)
October 5, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kathleen Barrett to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7311863), filed by Defendant NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC.. (Barrett, Kathleen)
October 5, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul DeCamp to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7311842), filed by Defendant NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC.. (DeCamp, Paul)
September 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Hans A. Nilges on behalf of Plaintiff JEFFERY WALTERS. (Nilges, Hans)
September 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Christopher J. Lalak on behalf of JEFFERY WALTERS (Lalak, Christopher)
September 19, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by JEFFERY WALTERS. NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC. served on 9/15/2022. (Lalak, Christopher)
September 13, 2022 Filing 7 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
September 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b), filed by Plaintiff JEFFERY WALTERS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Consent Form) (Lalak, Christopher)
September 12, 2022 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DRB)
September 12, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC.. (DRB)
September 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon M. Draher on behalf of Plaintiff JEFFERY WALTERS. (Draher, Shannon)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lalak on behalf of Plaintiff JEFFERY WALTERS. (Lalak, Christopher)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC., filed by JEFFERY WALTERS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7271471) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Lalak, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALTERS v. NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERY WALTERS
Represented By: Christopher Lalak
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Robi J. Baishnab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICE-PAK PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Brenna Rose McLean
Represented By: Kathleen Barrett
Represented By: Paul DeCamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?