PATTERSON v. HUNTER et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT EARL PATTERSON
Defendant: JASON HUNTER, SBP PROPERTIES, LLC and DUVALL & FALL P.C.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01805
Filed: September 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58 - For the reasons set forth in the Court's Order entered this day, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT against Plaintiff and in favor of Defendants. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/1/2022.(JSR)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and Mr. Patterson's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED AS MOOT, #5 . Final Judgment shall enter accordingly. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/1/2022. Copy to Plaintiff via US mail. (JSR)
October 17, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ROBERT EARL PATTERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JSR)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Mr. Patterson to file an Amended Complaint by October 17, 2022 which addresses the deficiencies noted. A review of the docket in this case indicates that Mr. Patterson has neither paid the $402 filing fee nor filed a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, despite his representation otherwise. Mr. Patterson shall have through October 17, 2022 in which to either: (1) pay the $402 filing fee for this action; or (2) demonstrate that he lacks the financial ability to do so by filing a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, indicating that he is unable to prepay the fee and stating his belief that he is entitled to redress. Mr. Patterson's Motion for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel, [Filing No. #2 ], is DENIED without prejudice as premature. Mr. Patterson may renew his request for counsel at an appropriate stage in the litigation. The Clerk is directed to include the attached form Request to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying the Filing Fee as an exhibit to this Order. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/21/2022. Copies to Plaintiff via US Mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying the Filing Fee) (JSR)
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 12, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Assistance Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff, ROBERT EARL PATTERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH)
September 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUVALL & FALL P.C., JASON HUNTER, SBP PROPERTIES, LLC, filed by ROBERT EARL PATTERSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Records from Marion County Superior Court Case No. 49D03-2208-PL-026947 including Summons, Complaint, Order to Show Cause, and Appearance, #2 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATTERSON v. HUNTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT EARL PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON HUNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBP PROPERTIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUVALL & FALL P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?