RODERICK v. SORRELL et al
Plaintiff: BYRON RODERICK
Defendant: BROOKYLNN SORRELL, SHANDA NOLLEY and BROOKLYNN SORRELL
Case Number: 1:2022cv01856
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58 - For the reasons set forth in the Court's Order entered this day, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT against Plaintiff and in favor of Defendants. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/15/2022. Copy to Plaintiff via US mail. (JSR)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Because Mr. Roderick has not filed an Amended Complaint setting forth a claim over which the Court has subject-matter jurisdiction, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Final Judgment shall enter accordingly. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/15/2022. Copy to Plaintiff via US mail. (JSR)
November 2, 2022 Filing 7 Submission of Exhibits in Support of Claim, filed by Plaintiff BYRON RODERICK. (JSR)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, DENYING MOTION FOR ASSISTANCE WITH RECRUITING COUNSEL, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - Mr. Roderick's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 , is GRANTED. Mr. Roderick's Complaint, #1 , is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Mr. Roderick shall have until November 2, 2022 to file an Amended Complaint that addresses the deficiencies outlined in this Entry and otherwise complies with federal pleading standards. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. Mr. Roderick's Motion for Assistance With Recruiting Counsel, #4 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/6/2022. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (JSR)
September 21, 2022 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DRB)
September 20, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff BYRON RODERICK. (DRB)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Plaintiff BYRON RODERICK. (DRB)
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHANDA NOLLEY, BROOKYLNN SORRELL, filed by BYRON RODERICK. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(DRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODERICK v. SORRELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BYRON RODERICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKYLNN SORRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANDA NOLLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKLYNN SORRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?