GEMA USA, INC. v. FIRST IN FINISHING INC.
Plaintiff: GEMA USA, INC.
Defendant: FIRST IN FINISHING INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02053
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Kellie M Barr
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
2 Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER- Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2023 at 1:30 PM (Eastern Time) by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. The Court will contact counsel by separate email with information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the Court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 12/13/2022.(CBU)
December 13, 2022 Filing 21 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by FIRST IN FINISHING INC.. (Stohry, Bradley)
December 13, 2022 Filing 20 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (JSR)
December 12, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by FIRST IN FINISHING INC..(Stohry, Bradley)
November 7, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant FIRST IN FINISHING INC.. (Stohry, Bradley)
November 7, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley M. Stohry on behalf of Defendant FIRST IN FINISHING INC.. (Stohry, Bradley)
November 2, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Process Upon Defendant First in Finishing Inc., filed by Plaintiff GEMA USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Green Card) (Floyd, Riley)
November 1, 2022 Filing 15 Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number (1:22-cv-02053-JMS-KMB), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (JD)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Caroline L Marsili for GEMA USA, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/28/2022. (SWM)
October 27, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Caroline L. Marsili to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7343660), filed by Plaintiff GEMA USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsili, Caroline)
October 25, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L) (JSR)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Erik G. Swenson for GEMA USA, INC. added. Copy to Caroline L. Marsili and First In Finishing Inc., c/o Monte R. McClung via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/24/2022. (SWM)
October 21, 2022 Filing 10 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JSR)
October 21, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Erik G. Swenson to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7334411), filed by Plaintiff GEMA USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swenson, Erik)
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
October 20, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to FIRST IN FINISHING INC. (DJH)
October 20, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gema USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Graco Inc. for Gema USA, Inc... (Limrick, Michael)
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to Gema USA, Inc.. (Limrick, Michael)
October 20, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff Gema USA, Inc.. (Limrick, Michael)
October 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Riley H. Floyd on behalf of Plaintiff Gema USA, Inc.. (Floyd, Riley)
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Limrick on behalf of Plaintiff Gema USA, Inc.. (Limrick, Michael)
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gema USA, Inc., filed by Gema USA, Inc.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7331831) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Limrick, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEMA USA, INC. v. FIRST IN FINISHING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEMA USA, INC.
Represented By: Michael R. Limrick
Represented By: Riley H. Floyd
Represented By: Caroline L Marsili
Represented By: Erik G. Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST IN FINISHING INC.
Represented By: Bradley M. Stohry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?