DONALDSON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS DONALDSON
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2022cv02155
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
2 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1407 Products Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 9 **PLEASE DISREGARD. DUPLICATE OF DKT. 23204** NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02766-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02214-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02221-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02245-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02259-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02263-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02284-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02314-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02339-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02343-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02348-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02358-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02364-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06797-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06911-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06912-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06914-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06915-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06916-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06917-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06918-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06922-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06923-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06926-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06928-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06931-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06934-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06935-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) Modified on 12/22/2022 (LBT).
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02766-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02214-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02221-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02245-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02259-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02263-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02284-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02314-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02339-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02343-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02348-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02358-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02364-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06797-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06911-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06912-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06914-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06915-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06916-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06917-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06918-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06922-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06923-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06926-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06928-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06931-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06934-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06935-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02766-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02214-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02221-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02245-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02259-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02263-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02284-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02314-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02339-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02343-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02348-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02358-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02364-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06797-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06911-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06912-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06914-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06915-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06916-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06917-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06918-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06922-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06923-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06926-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06928-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06931-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06934-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06935-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 11/28/2022. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB (LBT)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/28/2022.(LBT)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Richard L. Young, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-CV-2155 RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (LF)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Glitz on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS DONALDSON. (Glitz, Jessica)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Basil E. Adham on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS DONALDSON. (Adham, Basil)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DENNIS DONALDSON. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7361658) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adham, Basil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DONALDSON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS DONALDSON
Represented By: Jessica Glitz
Represented By: Basil E. Adham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?