BINGHAM-WOODSON v. COOK MEDICAL INC
Plaintiff: CHEQUITA BINGHAM-WOODSON and CHEQUITA BINGHAM WOODSON
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INC, IVC FILTERS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2022cv02168
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
2 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
3 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 **PLEASE DISREGARD. DUPLICATE OF DKT. 23204** NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02766-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02214-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02221-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02245-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02259-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02263-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02284-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02314-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02339-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02343-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02348-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02358-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02364-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06797-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06911-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06912-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06914-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06915-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06916-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06917-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06918-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06922-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06923-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06926-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06928-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06931-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06934-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06935-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) Modified on 12/22/2022 (LBT).
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02766-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02214-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02221-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02245-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02259-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02263-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02284-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02314-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02339-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02343-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02348-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02358-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02364-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06797-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06911-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06912-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06914-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06915-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06916-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06917-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06918-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06922-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06923-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06926-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06928-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06931-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06934-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06935-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea)
December 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02766-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02214-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02221-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02245-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02259-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02263-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02284-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02314-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02339-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02343-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02348-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02358-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02364-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06797-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06911-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06912-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06913-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06914-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06915-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06916-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06917-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06918-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06922-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06923-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06926-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06928-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06931-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06934-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06935-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 11/28/2022. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02155-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02168-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02197-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-02203-RLY-TAB (LBT)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/28/2022.(LBT)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt, Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-CV-2168 RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (LF)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Callum Fraser on behalf of Plaintiff CHEQUITA BINGHAM-WOODSON. (Fraser, Scott)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against COOK MEDICAL INC, IVC FILTERS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, filed by CHEQUITA BINGHAM-WOODSON. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7363657) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fraser, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BINGHAM-WOODSON v. COOK MEDICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHEQUITA BINGHAM-WOODSON
Represented By: Scott Callum Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHEQUITA BINGHAM WOODSON
Represented By: Scott Callum Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INC, IVC FILTERS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?