APOTEX INC. et al v. ELI LILLY & COMPANY
Plaintiff: APOTEX INC. and APOTEX CORP.
Defendant: ELI LILLY & COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2022cv02342
Filed: December 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Consent Judgment Order) (JSR)
January 27, 2023 Filing 18 CONSENT JUDGMENT - Plaintiffs Apotex Inc. and Apotex Corp. ("Plaintiffs" or "Apotex") and Defendant Eli Lilly and Company ("Defendant" or "Lilly"), by their undersigned counsel, stipulate and agree as follows. (See Judgment.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/27/2023. (JSR)
January 23, 2023 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Entry of Consent Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment - Consent Judgment)(O'Malley, Katherine)
January 17, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Answer in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Answer) (JSR)
January 13, 2023 Filing 15 DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint OF APOTEX INC. AND APOTEX CORP., filed by ELI LILLY & COMPANY.(Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2023 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/11/2023.(SWM)
December 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant ELI LILLY & COMPANY. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
December 27, 2022 Filing 12 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by ELI LILLY & COMPANY. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
December 27, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Pollack-Milgate on behalf of Defendant ELI LILLY & COMPANY. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
December 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (JSR)
December 9, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by APOTEX INC., APOTEX CORP.. ELI LILLY & COMPANY served on 12/8/2022. (O'Malley, Katherine)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JSR)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC. identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Pharmaceutical Holdings Inc. for APOTEX INC.; Corporate Parent APOSHERM DELAWARE HOLDING CORP. for APOTEX CORP... (O'Malley, Katherine)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DRB)
December 7, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY & COMPANY. (DRB)
December 7, 2022 Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DRB)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC. identifying Corporate Parent APOTEX HOLDINGS, INC. for APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC... (O'Malley, Katherine)
December 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine C. O'Malley on behalf of Plaintiffs APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC.. (O'Malley, Katherine)
December 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY & COMPANY, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7398249) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US7517334, #2 Exhibit B - 2022.11.18 - PIV List, #3 Exhibit C - Antares_Investor_Presentation_March_2021, #4 Exhibit D - Antares Investor Presentation March 2022, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons Eli Lilly)(O'Malley, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APOTEX INC. et al v. ELI LILLY & COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APOTEX INC.
Represented By: Katherine C. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: Katherine C. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELI LILLY & COMPANY
Represented By: Deborah Pollack-Milgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?