WHITE v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: DONALD D. WHITE, SR.
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2022cv06888
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff DONALD WHITE. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06888-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer)
October 14, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DONALD WHITE.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06888-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer)
September 20, 2022 Filing 11 Remark - Case Transferred In from Southern District of Alabama, Cause No. 1:22-cv-321 on 9/20/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6888-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Connecticut, Cause No. 3:22-cv-1077 on 9/15/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6889-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Mississippi, Cause No. 3:22-cv-476 on 9/16/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6890-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06888-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06889-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06890-RLY-TAB (LBT)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/20/2022.(LBT)
September 20, 2022 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00321. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 15, 2022 Filing 8 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Southern District of Indiana requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. Case Closed. (cjr) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/20/2022.]
August 24, 2022 Filing 7 Answer due from Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, and Cook Medical, LLC pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (meh) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/20/2022.]
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet; Complaint; Summons served on Cook Medical LLC on August 22, 2022, filed by Donald D White, Sr. (Ferguson, Carmen) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/20/2022.]
August 23, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet; Complaint; Summons served on Cook Medical Incorporated on August 22, 2022, filed by Donald D White, Sr. (Ferguson, Carmen) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/20/2022.]
August 23, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet; Complaint; Summons served on Cook Incorporated on August 23, 2022, filed by Donald D White, Sr. (Ferguson, Carmen) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/20/2022.]
August 23, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet; Complaint; Summons served on Cook Group Incorporated on August 22, 2022, filed by Donald D White, Sr. (Ferguson, Carmen) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/20/2022.]
August 18, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/20/2022.]
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3056683, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Donald D White, Sr. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Cook Group Incorporated, #3 Summons - Cook Incorporated, #4 Summons - Cook Medical Incorporated, #5 Summons - Cook Medical, LLC) (Ferguson, Carmen) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/20/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD D. WHITE, SR.
Represented By: Carmen Ferguson
Represented By: Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?