WALTON v. UPROVA CREDIT LLC et al
Plaintiff: AARON WALTON
Defendant: UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC, UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., POMO ONE MARKETING INC., HABEMCO LLC, GENEL ILYASOVA, MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER, DENISE DEHAEMERS, SARAH MARIE HIMMLER, DAVID STOVER and JOHN DOES 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv00520
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Filing 23 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Stay re #20 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration , filed by Defendants DENISE DEHAEMERS, HABEMCO LLC, MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER, SARAH MARIE HIMMLER, GENEL ILYASOVA, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., DAVID STOVER, UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC. (Croker, Paul)
May 18, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay re #20 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration , filed by Defendants DENISE DEHAEMERS, HABEMCO LLC, MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER, SARAH MARIE HIMMLER, GENEL ILYASOVA, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., DAVID STOVER, UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC. (Croker, Paul)
May 18, 2023 Filing 21 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration , filed by Defendants DENISE DEHAEMERS, HABEMCO LLC, MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER, SARAH MARIE HIMMLER, GENEL ILYASOVA, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., DAVID STOVER, UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Croker, Paul)
May 18, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration, filed by Defendants DENISE DEHAEMERS, HABEMCO LLC, MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER, SARAH MARIE HIMMLER, GENEL ILYASOVA, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., DAVID STOVER, UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC. (Croker, Paul)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Paul Crocker for DENISE DEHAEMERS, JOHN DOES 1-20, HABEMCO LLC, MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER, SARAH MARIE HIMMLER, GENEL ILYASOVA, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., DAVID STOVER, UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, and for UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC added. The Clerk of the Court notes that your contact information does not match the attorney record in CM/ECF. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-3(b)(1), an attorney who has registered to use the ECF system must submit an update to her/his contact information to each individual court in which the attorney practices, via PACER, within 5 business days of any change. The Court requests that you update your contact information. Copy to Paul Croker via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/19/203. (SWM)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendants' #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 5/19/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/19/2023. (SWM)
April 18, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul Croker to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7595542), filed by Defendants DENISE DEHAEMERS, JOHN DOES 1-20, HABEMCO LLC, MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER, SARAH MARIE HIMMLER, GENEL ILYASOVA, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., DAVID STOVER, UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC. (Croker, Paul)
April 18, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Smith on behalf of Defendants DENISE DEHAEMERS, HABEMCO LLC, MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER, SARAH MARIE HIMMLER, GENEL ILYASOVA, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., DAVID STOVER, UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC. (Smith, Brooke)
April 18, 2023 Filing 15 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by HABEMCO LLC, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC identifying Corporate Parent Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake for HABEMCO LLC, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC.. (Korin, Offer)
April 18, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to May 19, 2023 in which to #1 Complaint [to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint], filed by Defendants DENISE DEHAEMERS, HABEMCO LLC, MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER, SARAH MARIE HIMMLER, GENEL ILYASOVA, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., DAVID STOVER, UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Korin, Offer)
April 18, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Offer Korin on behalf of Defendants DENISE DEHAEMERS, HABEMCO LLC, MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER, SARAH MARIE HIMMLER, GENEL ILYASOVA, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., DAVID STOVER, UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC. (Korin, Offer)
April 12, 2023 Filing 12 RETURN of Service, filed by AARON WALTON. UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC. served on 4/4/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
April 12, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN of Service, filed by AARON WALTON. POMO ONE MARKETING INC. served on 4/4/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
April 12, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN of Service, filed by AARON WALTON. DAVID STOVER served on 4/4/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 29, 2023 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by AARON WALTON. SARAH MARIE HIMMLER served on 3/29/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 29, 2023 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by AARON WALTON. HABEMCO LLC served on 3/29/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 27, 2023 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DRB)
March 27, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DENISE DEHAEMERS, JOHN DOES 1-20, HABEMCO LLC, MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER, SARAH MARIE HIMMLER, GENEL ILYASOVA, POMO ONE MARKETING INC., DAVID STOVER, UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC., UPROVA CREDIT LLC, UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC. (DRB)
March 27, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DRB)
March 24, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Goldstein on behalf of Plaintiff AARON WALTON. (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 24, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather A. Kolbus on behalf of Plaintiff AARON WALTON. (Kolbus, Heather)
March 24, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Edelman on behalf of Plaintiff AARON WALTON. (Edelman, Daniel)
March 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against All Defendants, filed by AARON WALTON. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7559716) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALTON v. UPROVA CREDIT LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON WALTON
Represented By: Heather A. Kolbus
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPROVA CREDIT LLC
Represented By: Brooke Smith
Represented By: Offer Korin
Represented By: Paul Crocker
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPROVA HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: Brooke Smith
Represented By: Offer Korin
Represented By: Paul Crocker
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPPER LAKE PROCESSING SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Brooke Smith
Represented By: Offer Korin
Represented By: Paul Crocker
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POMO ONE MARKETING INC.
Represented By: Brooke Smith
Represented By: Offer Korin
Represented By: Paul Crocker
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HABEMCO LLC
Represented By: Brooke Smith
Represented By: Offer Korin
Represented By: Paul Crocker
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENEL ILYASOVA
Represented By: Brooke Smith
Represented By: Offer Korin
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Represented By: Paul Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMER
Represented By: Brooke Smith
Represented By: Offer Korin
Represented By: Paul Crocker
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISE DEHAEMERS
Represented By: Paul Crocker
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Represented By: Brooke Smith
Represented By: Offer Korin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH MARIE HIMMLER
Represented By: Brooke Smith
Represented By: Offer Korin
Represented By: Paul Crocker
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID STOVER
Represented By: Brooke Smith
Represented By: Offer Korin
Represented By: Paul Crocker
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-20
Represented By: Paul Crocker
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?