MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE et al v. CADENCE MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC
Plaintiff: MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE and INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Defendant: CADENCE MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01439
Filed: August 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER - TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An Initial Pretrial Conference is set for Monday, 11/20/2023 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. SEE ORDER for addition instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/4/2023.(KAA)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Defendant's #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 11/9/2023. No further enlargement of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/4/2023. (SWM)
October 3, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/9/23 to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant CADENCE MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stemerick, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2023 Filing 10 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by CADENCE MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC. (Stemerick, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant CADENCE MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC. (Stemerick, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Stemerick on behalf of Defendant CADENCE MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC. (Stemerick, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. CADENCE MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC served on 8/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Schwartz, Donald)
August 16, 2023 Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before District Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (AAS)
August 16, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (AAS)
August 16, 2023 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
August 16, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CADENCE MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC. (AAS)
August 15, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE. (Schwartz, Donald)
August 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CADENCE MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC, filed by MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7766570) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Agreement)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE et al v. CADENCE MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CADENCE MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Stemerick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?