MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE et al v. SPECCON, INC.
Plaintiff: MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE and INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Defendant: SPECCON, INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01864
Filed: October 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to January 12, 2024 , filed by Defendant SPECCON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casey, James)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on FRIDAY, JANUARY 12, 2024, at 10:00 a.m., Indianapolis Time (EST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Mario Garcia, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 11/9/2023.(JRB)
November 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re, filed by Defendant SPECCON, INC.. (Casey, James)
November 7, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Casey on behalf of Defendant SPECCON, INC.. (Casey, James)
October 26, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. SPECCON, INC. served on 10/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Schwartz, Donald)
October 18, 2023 Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (CW)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (CW)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (CW)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SPECCON, INC.. (CW)
October 17, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE. (Schwartz, Donald)
October 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SPECCON, INC., filed by MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE, INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7857978) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report Forms, #2 Exhibit B - Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE et al v. SPECCON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATT RHOADES, TRUSTEE
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECCON, INC.
Represented By: James P. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?