SADOWSKI et al. v. CIRCLE CITY BROADCASTING I, LLC d/b/a WISH-TV
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER SADOWSKI and CIRCLE CITY BROADCASTING I, LLC d/b/a WISH-TV
Case Number: 1:2024cv00324
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Trial Demand), filed by CIRCLE CITY BROADCASTING I, LLC d/b/a WISH-TV.(Hartz, Blake)
April 19, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane T. Moreillon on behalf of Defendant CIRCLE CITY BROADCASTING I, LLC d/b/a WISH-TV. (Moreillon, Shane)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2024 03:30 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/10/2024.(SWM)
March 26, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (CKM)
March 21, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant CIRCLE CITY BROADCASTING I, LLC d/b/a WISH-TV. (Hartz, Blake)
March 21, 2024 Filing 9 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by CIRCLE CITY BROADCASTING I, LLC d/b/a WISH-TV. (Hartz, Blake)
March 21, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake R. Hartz on behalf of Defendant CIRCLE CITY BROADCASTING I, LLC d/b/a WISH-TV. (Hartz, Blake)
March 6, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent on March 1, 2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Swift, Michael)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (CKM) Modified on 2/26/2024 (CKM).
February 26, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CIRCLE CITY BROADCASTING I, LLC d/b/a WISH-TV. (CKM)
February 26, 2024 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (CKM) Modified on 2/26/2024 (CKM).
February 22, 2024 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by CHRISTOPHER SADOWSKI. (Swift, Michael)
February 22, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Swift on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER SADOWSKI. (Swift, Michael)
February 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8038185) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Example of Defendant's Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Swift, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SADOWSKI et al. v. CIRCLE CITY BROADCASTING I, LLC d/b/a WISH-TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER SADOWSKI
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIRCLE CITY BROADCASTING I, LLC d/b/a WISH-TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?