AUGUST IMAGE, LLC v. INDY FOUNDERS LLC d/b/a POWDERKEG
Plaintiff: AUGUST IMAGE, LLC
Defendant: INDY FOUNDERS LLC d/b/a POWDERKEG
Case Number: 1:2024cv00617
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: M Kendra Klump
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Defendant's #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 6/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump on 6/4/2024. (SWM)
May 31, 2024 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to June 17, 2024 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant INDY FOUNDERS LLC d/b/a POWDERKEG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutchinson, Adam)
May 9, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Garrett Hutchinson on behalf of Defendant INDY FOUNDERS LLC d/b/a POWDERKEG. (Hutchinson, Adam)
April 26, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant INDY FOUNDERS LLC d/b/a POWDERKEG. (Polak, Jonathan)
April 26, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Polak on behalf of Defendant INDY FOUNDERS LLC d/b/a POWDERKEG. (Polak, Jonathan)
April 16, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Exhibits served on Registered Agent on April 15, 2024, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Swift, Michael)
April 9, 2024 Filing 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by AUGUST IMAGE, LLC. (Swift, Michael)
April 9, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (AAT)
April 9, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (AAT)
April 9, 2024 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAT)
April 9, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to INDY FOUNDERS LLC d/b/a POWDERKEG. (AAT)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Swift on behalf of Plaintiff AUGUST IMAGE, LLC. (Swift, Michael)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AUGUST IMAGE, LLC v. INDY FOUNDERS LLC d/b/a POWDERKEG against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8106043) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registration Certificate, #2 Exhibit B - Infringement Example, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Swift, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUGUST IMAGE, LLC v. INDY FOUNDERS LLC d/b/a POWDERKEG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUGUST IMAGE, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDY FOUNDERS LLC d/b/a POWDERKEG
Represented By: Adam Garrett Hutchinson
Represented By: Jonathan G. Polak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?