STEPHEN KNOWLES, TRUSTEE et al v. SGI, INC.
Plaintiff: KENTUCKY, and BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL4 IN/KY INDIANAPOLIS, TERRE HAUTE, BLOOMINGTON PENSION FUND, BRICKLAYERS OF INDIANA RETIREMENT PLAN, BRICKLAYERS TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, STEPHEN KNOWLES, TRUSTEE and BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BAC 4 IN/KYAPPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA
Defendant: SGI, INC.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00997
Filed: June 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Pretrial Conference is set for Wednesday, 9/4/2024 at 9:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 7/3/2024.(KAA)
June 28, 2024 Filing 10 RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Schwartz, Donald)
June 25, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant SGI, INC.. (Stites, Anthony)
June 25, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Joseph Cohen on behalf of Defendant SGI, INC.. (Stites, Anthony) Modified to correct on 6/26/2024 (LF).
June 25, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Stites on behalf of Defendant SGI, INC.. (Stites, Anthony)
June 12, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SGI, INC.. (LF)
June 12, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (LF)
June 12, 2024 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LF)
June 12, 2024 Filing 3 **PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKETED IN ERROR**MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LF) Modified on 6/12/2024 (LF).
June 11, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BAC 4 IN/KYAPPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA, BRICKLAYERS OF INDIANA RETIREMENT PLAN, BRICKLAYERS TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, KENTUCKY, and BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL4 IN/KY INDIANAPOLIS, TERRE HAUTE, BLOOMINGTON PENSION FUND, STEPHEN KNOWLES, TRUSTEE. (Schwartz, Donald)
June 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8202816) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEPHEN KNOWLES, TRUSTEE et al v. SGI, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGI, INC.
Represented By: H. Joseph Cohen
Represented By: Anthony M. Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENTUCKY, and BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL4 IN/KY INDIANAPOLIS, TERRE HAUTE, BLOOMINGTON PENSION FUND
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICKLAYERS OF INDIANA RETIREMENT PLAN, BRICKLAYERS TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN KNOWLES, TRUSTEE
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BAC 4 IN/KYAPPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?