DUKURAY v. DOLGENCORP LLC.
Plaintiff: BUBACARY DUKURAY
Defendant: DOLGENCORP LLC.
Case Number: 1:2024cv01049
Filed: June 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Filing 17 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (KAA)
June 20, 2024 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
June 20, 2024 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 1:24-cv-00119. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: GRANTING #13 First MOTION to Change Venue filed by Bubacary Dukuray. The Court ORDERS that this case be transferred to the United States DistrictCourt for the Southern District of Indiana pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/18/24. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
June 5, 2024 Filing 13 First MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiff Bubacary Dukuray. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klezmer, Randal) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
May 14, 2024 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Paige, Pamela) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
April 23, 2024 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 5/14/2024. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2024 10:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/22/24. (slm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
April 18, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE by Bubacary Dukuray Jurisdictional Statement (Klezmer, Randal) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
April 18, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Randal M Klezmer on behalf of Bubacary Dukuray (Klezmer, Randal) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
March 22, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Dolgencorp, LLC.(King, Christie) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
March 18, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie A King on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC (King, Christie) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
March 18, 2024 **NEW CASE** Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
March 15, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dolgencorp, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dollar General Corporation for Dolgencorp, LLC.. (Paige, Pamela) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
March 15, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela A Paige on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC (Paige, Pamela) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
March 15, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5518958.) from Grant Circuit Court, Cause No. 27C01-2402-CT-000012, filed by Dolgencorp, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Record (Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Certified Mail Returned, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time), #4 Exhibit C - March 11, 2024 email, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Paige, Pamela) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]
February 9, 2024 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Dolgencorp, LLC, filed by Bubacary Dukuray. Complaint filed in Grant County Circuit Court, Case no. 27C01-2402-CT-000012.(nhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 6/20/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUKURAY v. DOLGENCORP LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUBACARY DUKURAY
Represented By: Randal M. Klezmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOLGENCORP LLC.
Represented By: Christie A. King
Represented By: Pamela A. Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?