GARRETT v. MARION COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY
Plaintiff: JACQUE D. GARRETT
Defendant: MARION COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2024cv01115
Filed: July 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF'S CUSTODIAN TO FORWARD CERTIFIED COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT - The Court ORDERS the Sheriff or his designee at the Marion County Jail to provide the Court with a certified copy of Mr. Garrett's trust account statement or the institutional equivalent for the six-month period prior to the filing of this action on July 1, 2024, and to do so by no later than September 13, 2024. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to distribution list via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 8/23/2024.(JRB)
August 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JACQUE D. GARRETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - note/letter regarding receipts, #2 Exhibits - Commissary Receipts, #3 Envelope)(DWH)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING FILING FEE - Mr. Garrett shall have through September 12, 2024, to pay the $405.00 filing fee for this action or to file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to take either action within the extended time permitted will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning or opportunity to show cause. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 8/13/2024.(JRB)
July 24, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JACQUE D. GARRETT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JRB)
July 11, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through August 12, 2024, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the 405.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). A form motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee is being provided for your use. NOTE TO PRISONER - If you seek leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee, and you are a prisoner, your motion must be accompanied by a copy of the transactions associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Attachments: #1 Motion For Leave To Proceed In Forma Pauperis) (JRT)
July 11, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail.) (JRT)
July 2, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH)
July 2, 2024 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
July 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARION COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY, filed by JACQUE D. GARRETT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARRETT v. MARION COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUE D. GARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?