KNOWLES, et al v. WEIGAND CONSTRUCTION CO, INC
Plaintiff: BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BAC 4 IN/KY APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIEDCRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA & KENTUCKY and STEPHEN KNOWLES
Defendant: WEIGAND CONSTRUCTION CO, INC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01131
Filed: July 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by STEPHEN KNOWLES, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIEDCRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA & KENTUCKY, BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BAC 4 IN/KY APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM. WEIGAND CONSTRUCTION CO, INC waiver sent on 7/29/2024. (Schwartz, Donald)
July 26, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Schwartz, Donald)
July 14, 2024 Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (BAA)
July 12, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH)
July 12, 2024 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
July 12, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WEIGAND CONSTRUCTION CO, INC. (DJH)
July 9, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BAC 4 IN/KY APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIEDCRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA & KENTUCKY, STEPHEN KNOWLES, TRUSTEE, BRICKLAYERS OF INDIANA RETIREMENT PLAN, BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND. (Schwartz, Donald)
July 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8237499) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Memorandum Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KNOWLES, et al v. WEIGAND CONSTRUCTION CO, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BAC 4 IN/KY APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING PROGRAM
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIEDCRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 OF INDIANA & KENTUCKY
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN KNOWLES
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIGAND CONSTRUCTION CO, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?