MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS et al v. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: INDIANA FOREST ALLIANCE INC, FRIENDS OF LAKE MONROE, MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS and HOOSIER ENVIRONMENTAL COUNCIL, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, MICHAEL CHAVEAS and CHRISTOPHER THORNTON
Case Number: 1:2024cv01560
Filed: September 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Kellie M Barr
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. § 181 Environment: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Parties' Joint Motion to Modify Schedule, ECF No. 22, (the "Motion"), and good cause appearing, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion [Dkt. #22 ]. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following deadlines are extended as follows: See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 11/8/2024. (LF)
November 7, 2024 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule, filed by Defendants UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, MICHAEL CHAVEAS, CHRISTOPHER THORNTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Reade)
November 5, 2024 Filing 21 *** PLEASE DISREGARD, DOCKETED IN ERROR*** NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANT MANUAL FILING #20 (CCG) Modified on 11/6/2024 (CCG).
November 4, 2024 Filing 20 Receipt of two flash drives received in Indianapolis Division re #19 NOTICE of Manual Filing Administrative Record re #1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Index) (Wilson, Reade) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (CCG)
November 1, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Manual Filing Administrative Record re #1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Index) (Wilson, Reade)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: This case is set for a Telephonic Status Conference on January 9, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. (Eastern), before United States Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. The Court will contact counsel through the Court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 10/31/2024.(LF)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Having considered the parties' proposal, the Court hereby adopts that proposal and ORDERS as follows: SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 10/31/2024.(LF)
October 29, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Manual Filing Administrative Record re #1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants (Wilson, Reade)
October 23, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Wilson, Reade)
October 23, 2024 Filing 14 Joint Briefing Schedule and CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, MICHAEL CHAVEAS, CHRISTOPHER THORNTON . (Wilson, Reade)
October 23, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachana Nagin Fischer on behalf of Defendants UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, MICHAEL CHAVEAS, CHRISTOPHER THORNTON. (Fischer, Rachana)
October 23, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Reade Wilson on behalf of Defendants UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, MICHAEL CHAVEAS, CHRISTOPHER THORNTON. (Wilson, Reade)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney William S. Eubanks II for FRIENDS OF LAKE MONROE,William S. Eubanks II for HOOSIER ENVIRONMENTAL COUNCIL, INC.,William S. Eubanks II for INDIANA FOREST ALLIANCE INC,William S. Eubanks II for MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 10/15/2024. (JRB)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Matthew Ryan Arnold for FRIENDS OF LAKE MONROE,Matthew Ryan Arnold for HOOSIER ENVIRONMENTAL COUNCIL, INC.,Matthew Ryan Arnold for INDIANA FOREST ALLIANCE INC,Matthew Ryan Arnold for MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 10/15/2024. (JRB)
October 11, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) William S. Eubanks II to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-8379511), filed by Plaintiffs FRIENDS OF LAKE MONROE, HOOSIER ENVIRONMENTAL COUNCIL, INC., INDIANA FOREST ALLIANCE INC, MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eubanks II, William)
October 11, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew R. Arnold to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-8378870), filed by Plaintiffs FRIENDS OF LAKE MONROE, HOOSIER ENVIRONMENTAL COUNCIL, INC., INDIANA FOREST ALLIANCE INC, MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Matthew)
September 16, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt and Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. Judge Sarah Evans Barker, Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:24-cv-01560-TWP-KMB, on all future filings in this matter. (CCG)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt and Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr for all further proceedings. This case is related to 4:20-cv-00106-TWP-KMB and 4:23-cv-00012-TWP-KMB. Judge Sarah Evans Barker and Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 09/16/2024. (LDH)
September 12, 2024 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
September 12, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (JRB)
September 12, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL CHAVEAS, CHRISTOPHER THORNTON and UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE. (JRB)
September 11, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Russell Sipes on behalf of Plaintiffs FRIENDS OF LAKE MONROE, HOOSIER ENVIRONMENTAL COUNCIL, INC., INDIANA FOREST ALLIANCE INC, MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS. (Sipes, W.)
September 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDIANA FOREST ALLIANCE INC, filed by INDIANA FOREST ALLIANCE INC. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8331852) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons)(Sipes, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS et al v. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
Represented By: Reade Wilson
Represented By: Rachana Nagin Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CHAVEAS
Represented By: Reade Wilson
Represented By: Rachana Nagin Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER THORNTON
Represented By: Reade Wilson
Represented By: Rachana Nagin Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA FOREST ALLIANCE INC
Represented By: W. Russell Sipes
Represented By: William S. Eubanks II
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRIENDS OF LAKE MONROE
Represented By: W. Russell Sipes
Represented By: William S. Eubanks II
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONROE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS
Represented By: W. Russell Sipes
Represented By: William S. Eubanks II
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOOSIER ENVIRONMENTAL COUNCIL, INC.
Represented By: W. Russell Sipes
Represented By: William S. Eubanks II
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?