LATKA v. INTEGRA BUILDERS LLC
Plaintiff: Amy Latka
Defendant: Integra Builders LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01591
Filed: September 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Kellie M Barr
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KELLIE M. BARR: This case is scheduled for an Initial Pretrial Conference by Zoom on December 16, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. (Eastern Time), before United States Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. The Court will contact counsel by separate email with information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully--it sets out expectations for the conference as well as the undersigned's typical Practices & Procedures. At least seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP that all counsel have approved. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 10/29/2024.(LF)
October 7, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Tarek E. Mercho hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Mercho, Tarek)
October 4, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant INTEGRA BUILDERS LLC. (Mercho, Tarek)
October 4, 2024 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by INTEGRA BUILDERS LLC. (Mercho, Tarek)
October 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tarek E. Mercho on behalf of Defendant INTEGRA BUILDERS LLC. (Mercho, Tarek)
October 1, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Michael Mercho on 10/01/2024, filed by AMY LATKA. (Deal, David)
September 24, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (KAA) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/24/2024 to correct author of work name) (KAA). Modified on 9/24/2024 (KAA).
September 24, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Michael Mercho on 09/23/2024, filed by AMY LATKA. (Deal, David)
September 17, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David Christopher Deal on behalf of Plaintiff AMY LATKA. (Deal, David)
September 17, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to INTEGRA BUILDERS LLC. (KAA) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/17/2024 to remove double heading) (KAA).
September 17, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (KAA)
September 17, 2024 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
September 17, 2024 Filing 2 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (KAA)
September 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Integra Builders LLC, filed by Amy Latka. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8336588) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Deal, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LATKA v. INTEGRA BUILDERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Latka
Represented By: David Christopher Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integra Builders LLC
Represented By: Tarek E. Mercho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?