ASHER-BUTLER v. AMAZON KDP et al
Plaintiff: ALLEN LEE ASHER-BUTLER
Defendant: JEFF BEZOS and AMAZON KDP
Case Number: 1:2024cv01776
Filed: October 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On October 16, 2024, we ordered Plaintiff Allen Lee Asher-Butler, a prisoner who is proceeding pro se, to complete and sign the affidavit attached to that Order within forty days. That deadline has now passed, and Plaintiff has not submitted a completed and signed affidavit as ordered by the Court. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within 28 days as to why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to follow court orders. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/6/2024 (Copy mailed to Plaintiff).(LBT)
November 7, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
October 30, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by ALLEN LEE ASHER-BUTLER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LF)
October 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Mr. Asher-Butler has submitted his account statement but the affidavit he has submitted is blank and neither signed nor dated. Accordingly, Mr. Asher-Butler is allowed 40 days from the date of this order to complete and sign the attached affidavit form to accompany the prison account statement he has already filed. We will reserve our ruling on Mr. Asher-Butler's motion to proceed in forma pauperis until he submits his affidavit, or the 40-day deadline passes, whichever comes first. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Request Form)(JRB)
October 8, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (KLS) (CCG)
October 8, 2024 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (CCG)
October 4, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ALLEN LEE ASHER-BUTLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(CCG)
October 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMAZON KDP, JEFF BEZOS, filed by ALLEN LEE ASHER-BUTLER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASHER-BUTLER v. AMAZON KDP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN LEE ASHER-BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF BEZOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON KDP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?