JOHNSON v. BRIDGES OF INDIANA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BOBBIE J. JOHNSON
Defendant: BRIDGES OF INDIANA, INC., JON BURLISON and PRISCILLA BURLISON
Case Number: 2:2010cv00153
Filed: June 14, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Terre Haute Office
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 57 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 3/17/2011. (NRN)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ENTRY on motions relating to class certification; denying 35 Motion to Certify Class; denying as moot 37 Motion for Approval of Proposed Collective Action Notice (dkt. no. 37) is DENIED AS MOOT.(see order for more details). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 9/28/2010. (VS)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 8/2/2010. (NRN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. BRIDGES OF INDIANA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIDGES OF INDIANA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON BURLISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRISCILLA BURLISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBIE J. JOHNSON
Represented By: Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?