HAWKINS v. ALORICA INCORPORATED
Plaintiff: RENEE M. HAWKINS
Defendant: ALORICA INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2011cv00283
Filed: October 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Terre Haute Office
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Presiding Judge: William G. Hussmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 283 Motion to Compel. See order for specifics. Because this motion has been granted, in part, and denied, in part, the court will not assess attorney's fees to either side at this time. To the extent the matter is litigated, the appropriate awarding of attorney's fees for this motion will be taken up at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 5/22/2013. (NRN)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER - The Motion for Permissive Joinder of Twelve Party Plaintiffs, 99 , and the Motion to Determine Validity of Written Notices of Consent Filed by Twelve Opt-In Plaintiffs or, in the Alternative, Motion For Equitable Tolling of Statute of Limitations, 100 , are DENIED. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/30/2012. (RSF)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - Ms. Hawkins' Motion to Certify Combined Class Action and FLSA Collective Action (related to pre- and post-shift work), 36 , and her related Motion for Approval of Class and Collective Action Notice, 38 , are DENIED. Ms. Hawkins 9; individual pre- and post-shift work claims under both the FLSA and the IWPA will proceed. Ms. Hawkins' Supplemental Motion to Certify Combined Class Action and FLSA Collective Action (related to unpaid breaks), 77 , is GRANTED with revis ed class definitions. The Court CONDITIONALLY CERTIFIES the class under the FLSA. The Court also CERTIFIES the class under the IWPA. Ms. Hawkins' Revised Motion for Approval of Class and Collective Action Notice, 79 , is DENIED and the Co urt ORDERS the parties to meet and confer, and by October 17, 2012 submit a joint report in this matter setting forth a proposed plan (or alternative plans) as to what notice, in light of the Court's Order, should be provided to the classes. Further, the Court DESIGNATES Renee M. Hawkins as the representative plaintiff and, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g), DESIGNATES Robert P. Kondras, Jr. of Hunt, Hassler & Lorenz LLP as lead class counsel. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/25/2012. (RSF)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Compel. The Magistrate Judge TAKES UNDER ADVISEMENT whether any additional data must be produced until after the results of the random sampling are analyzed and the costs of further production are better defined. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 7/20/2012. (NRN)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ENTRY ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE AMEND COMPLAINT - granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/12/2012. (RSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAWKINS v. ALORICA INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENEE M. HAWKINS
Represented By: Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALORICA INCORPORATED
Represented By: Peter N. Farley
Represented By: Gregory W. Guevara
Represented By: Allegra J. Lawrence-Hardy
Represented By: Kurt E. Lentz
Represented By: Andrew M. McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?