HARRIS v. OLIVER
Plaintiff: WILLIAM OSCAR HARRIS
Defendant: JOHN C. OLIVER
Case Number: 2:2013cv00043
Filed: February 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Terre Haute Office
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Presiding Judge: William G. Hussmann
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Entry Discussing Request to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis - denying 67 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, as his appeal is not taken in good faith. USCA #14-1168). Copy to petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 2/14/2014. (RSF)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Entry and Order Dismissing Action - William Harris seeks a writ of habeas corpus. His custodian opposes the petition. Having considered the pleadings and the expanded record, and being duly advised, the court finds that the petitioner's petit ion for writ of habeas corpus should be denied and the action dismissed. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. (See Entry.) (USCA #s 13-2770 & 13-3289). Copy to petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/19/2013.(RSF)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 20 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/29/2013 (copy sent to William Oscar Harris)(copy sent to COA via e-mail) (CBU)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRIS v. OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM OSCAR HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C. OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?