SMITH v. USP TERRE-HAUTE et al
Plaintiff: |
RICKY JEROME SMITH |
Defendant: |
ASSOCIATE WARDEN, SHU P.A., WARDEN, USP TERRE-HAUTE, CAPTAIN, HEALTH SERVICE ADMINISTRATOR, LIEUTENANT, MEDICAL STAFF and NURSES |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00087 |
Filed: |
March 8, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Terre Haute Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William T. Lawrence |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Hussmann |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 28, 2013 |
Filing
28
Entry Granting Motion for Summary Judgment and Directing Entry of Final Judgment - The defendants' motion for summary judgment on the basis that Smith failed to exhaust his administrate remedies prior to filing this lawsuit 23 is granted. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. (See Entry.) Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/28/2013. (RSF)
|
April 30, 2013 |
Filing
8
Entry Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Dismissing Insufficient Claims, and Directing Further Proceedings - The motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Dkt. No. 5] is granted. The assessment of even a partial filing fee is not feasible at this time. Certain claims must be dismissed. No partial final judgment shall issue as to the claims dismissed in this Entry. For the time being, the Eighth Amendment claims shall proceed against the USP Terre Haute Warden and the USP Terre Haute Clinical Director. The clerk is designated, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(2), to issue process to the USP Terre Haute Warden and the USP Terre Haute Clinical Director. Process shall consist of a summons. Because the plaintiff is proceeding u nder the theory recognized in Bivens v. Six Unknown Named Agents of Federal Bureau of Narcotics, 403 U.S. 388 (1971), personal service is required. The Warden and the Clinical Director shall have thirty (30) days from the date they appear in the action in which to file a single response to the motion for preliminary injunction. (See Entry.) Copies distributed pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 4/30/2013.(RSF)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?