STEPP v. COLVIN

Defendant: CAROLYN COLVIN
Miscellaneous: SSA (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff: SHEILA STEPP
Case Number: 2:2013cv00179
Filed: May 13, 2013
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Terre Haute Office
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Referring Judge: William G. Hussmann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 12/15/2015. (NRN)
August 1, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT - The original 36 Final Judgment Entry entered in this action is AMENDED, and the Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED. The Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 8/1/2014.(NRN)
May 22, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT - After oral argument held before the Court on April 24, 2014, and pursuant to the Findings attached hereto, the decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED under Sentence Six of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and REMANDED to theCommissioner for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 5/22/2014.(NRN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEPP v. COLVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN COLVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA STEPP
Represented By: Timothy E. Burns
Represented By: Joseph R. Wambach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?