TAYLOR v. DANIELS et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT TAYLOR
Defendant: CHARLES A. DANIELS, GILBERT, GRIFFEN, HANISCH, JOSLYN, LUTZ, CHARLES SAMUALS, TARRH, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY and UNKNOWN CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS
Case Number: 2:2015cv00348
Filed: November 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Terre Haute Office
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Presiding Judge: William G. Hussmann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ENTRY FOLLOWING BENCH TRIAL - The Court conducted a bench trial in this action on February 11, 2019. This action was brought under the theory set forth in Bivens v. Six Unknown Named Agents, 403 U.S. 388 (1971). The issue for trial was whether th e defendants subjected Mr. Taylor to excessive force on November 12, 2014, in violation of the Eighth Amendment to the United States Constitution. The Court summarizes its findings as follows: Judgment is entered in favor of Mr. Robert Taylor and against Officer James Lotz, in the amount of $2,000.00 in compensatory damages. Judgment is entered in favor of defendant Officers Charles Gilbert, Steven Griffin, and Christopher Tarrh. Mr. Taylor is awarded no damages as to the claims ag ainst these defendants. The clerk is directed to update the spelling of defendant "Christopher Tarrh's" name on the docket. The clerk is directed to update Mr. Taylor's address on the docket, as indicated in the distribution list on this Entry. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/28/2019. (DMW)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL - Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions Against Bureau of Prisons Terre Haute Indiana for Failure to Respond to Discovery and Produce Memorandum of Hector Rivera [Dkt. 163 is DENIED (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/15/2018. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DW)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Entry Discussing Emergency Motion for Protection and Transfer, Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, and Motion for Court to Investigate - Mr. Taylor's emergency motion for protection and transfer to another facility, dkt. 115 , is denied. To the e xtent Mr. Taylor's motion relates to his legal papers being confiscated from his cell, dkt. 115 , it is granted consistent with the directions issued above to defendants' counsel. Mr. Taylor's motion for evidentiary hearing on his e mergency motion, dkt. 124 , is denied as moot. Accordingly, Mr. Taylor's pro se motion to investigate, dkt. 126 , is denied (SEE ENTRY INFORMATION AND INSTRUCTIONS). Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/27/2017. (DW)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ENTRY on Pavey Hearing Rejecting Affirmative Defense of Failure to Exhaust Available Administrative Remedies - For the reasons discussed above, the defendants' defense of failure to exhaust available administrative remedies is rejected. T his action shall now proceed to the merits of Mr. Taylor's claims. The Magistrate Judge is requested to set a status conference to direct the further development of this action. The reason for the appointment of recruited counsel, Ms. Larim ore and Ms. Riddle, has concluded. Thus, counsel may file a motion to withdraw, but the Court would welcome their continued representation should they choose not to withdraw. The clerk shall also update the docket to correct the spelling of Officer Lotz' last name (SEE ENTRY). Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/31/2017.(DW)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Entry Denying Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, and Directing Further Proceedings - Plaintiff Robert Taylor ("Mr. Taylor") is a federal inmate formerly confined at the United States Pe nitentiary in Terre Haute, Indiana ("USP Terre Haute"). After screening the complaint and dismissing some claims, the Court determined that Mr. Taylor's claims of excessive force would proceed against Officers Gilbert, Griffen, Lutz , and Tarrh (the "Defendants"). The affirmative defense of failure to exhaust is therefore rejected. The Defendants' motion for summary judgment [dkt. 34 ] is denied. Mr. Taylor's motion to amend complaint [dkt. 43 ] is denied. (See Entry.) Copy to plaintiff via US MailDispositive Motions due by 3/1/2017., Discovery due by 2/1/2017.). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/13/2016.(RSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. DANIELS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES A. DANIELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRIFFEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSLYN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES SAMUALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARRH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?