RODRIGUEZ v. WARDEN

Petitioner: RICKY LEE RODRIGUEZ
Respondent: WARDEN
Case Number: 2:2018cv00356
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Terre Haute Office
0 Judge: William T Lawrence
1 Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER - Granting #8 Respondent's motion for a sixty (60) day extension of time to respond to the Petitioner's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. The Respondent shall have to and including November 26, 2018, to file its response to the 2241 motion. Copy to Petitioner via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/1/2018. (DMW)
September 27, 2018 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to November 26, 2018 in which to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Brief(Habeas) , filed by Respondent WARDEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, James)
September 27, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert Wood on behalf of Respondent WARDEN. (Wood, James)
August 30, 2018 6 RECEIPT #IP061856 for Habeas filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by Petitioner. (REO)
August 23, 2018 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by RICKY LEE RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
August 20, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The United States is notified of the filing of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and of the supporting memorandum. This material has been scanned into the Court's electronic docket. A copy of this Entry and Order to Show Cause shall be distributed to the United States Attorney. The respondent shall have until September 27, 2018, in which to answer the allegations of the habeas petition, and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. The petitioner shall have twenty-eight days, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. (See Order.) Copy to Petitioner via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 8/20/2018. (DMW)
August 14, 2018 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 14, 2018 2 Brief re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by RICKY LEE RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 exhibits including court records, Offender Profile, and criminal incidents report, #2 Envelope)(DJH)
August 14, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by RICKY LEE RODRIGUEZ. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A letter, #2 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIGUEZ v. WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RICKY LEE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Represented By: James Robert Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?