INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED v. BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., et al
Plaintiff: INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED
Defendant: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC, RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE LLC, MICHAEL GRAVES, FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC., BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC., RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC and FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE WABASH VALLEY
Case Number: 2:2018cv00506
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER - Granting #32 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Judah Bellin granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing as counsel on behalf of the Defendants BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC, FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHAEL GRAVES, NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC., RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC in the above-styled cause only. Copy to PHV applicant via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/14/2019. (DMW)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - Granting #31 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Julia Chapman granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing as counsel on behalf of Defendants BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC, FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHAEL GRAVES, NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC., RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC, in the above-styled cause only. Copy to PHV applicant via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/14/2019. (DMW)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - Granting #30 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Steven E. Bizar granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing as counsel on behalf of the Defendants BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC, FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHAEL GRAVES, NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC., RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC, in the above-styled cause only. Copy to PHV applicant via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/14/2019. (DMW)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 3:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. (See Order for additional information and deadlines.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/11/2019. (DMW)
January 9, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC identifying Corporate Parent FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent Fresenius Medical Care AG & CO. KGaA for RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC.. (Gasper, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent Fresenius Medical Care AG & CO. KGaA for FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC.. (Gasper, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Fresenius Medical Care AG & CO. KGaA for FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC... (Gasper, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent Fresenius Medical Care AG & CO. KGaA for BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC... (Gasper, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC. identifying Corporate Parent FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent Fresenius Medical Care AG & CO. KGaA for FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC... (Gasper, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent Fresenius Medical Care AG & CO. KGaA for FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC.. (Gasper, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC. identifying Corporate Parent FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent Fresenius Medical Care AG & CO. KGaA for NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC... (Gasper, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Attorney(s) Judah Bellin to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5228704), filed by Defendants BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC, FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHAEL GRAVES, NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC., RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gasper, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Julia Chapman to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5228675), filed by Defendants BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC, FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHAEL GRAVES, NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC., RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gasper, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven E. Bizar to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5228573), filed by Defendants BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC, FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHAEL GRAVES, NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC., RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gasper, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Pahl Zinn on behalf of Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (Zinn, L.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel B. Gardner on behalf of Defendants BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC, FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHAEL GRAVES, NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC., RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC. (Gardner, Samuel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by George A. Gasper on behalf of Defendants BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC, FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHAEL GRAVES, NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC., RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC. (Gasper, George)
December 11, 2018 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC. waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McKee, Craig)
December 11, 2018 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McKee, Craig)
December 11, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC. waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McKee, Craig)
December 11, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McKee, Craig)
December 11, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC. waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McKee, Craig)
December 11, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McKee, Craig)
December 11, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McKee, Craig)
December 11, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. MICHAEL GRAVES waiver sent on 11/20/2018. (McKee, Craig)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw Documents #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , and #11 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/30/2018. (JRB)
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw #7 Request for Waiver of Service, #11 Request for Waiver of Service, #6 Request for Waiver of Service, #4 Request for Waiver of Service, #5 Request for Waiver of Service, #9 Request for Waiver of Service, #10 Request for Waiver of Service, #8 Request for Waiver of Service , filed by Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKee, Craig)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (DMW)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW)
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC, FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHAEL GRAVES, NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC., RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC. (DMW)
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 Submission of Corrected Exhibit D of Complaint, filed by Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig) Modified on 11/21/2018 - created link to #1 (RSF).
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WITHDRAWN BY #18 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. on 11/20/2018, filed by Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig) Modified on 11/30/2018 (JRB).
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WITHDRAWN BY #18 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Michael Graves on 11/20/2018, filed by Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig) Modified on 11/30/2018 (JRB).
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WITHDRAWN BY #18 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc. on 11/20/2018, filed by Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig) Modified on 11/30/2018 (JRB).
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WITHDRAWN BY #18 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to National Medical Care on 11/20/2018, filed by Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig) Modified on 11/30/2018 (JRB).
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WITHDRAWN BY #18 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Fresenius Medical Care of Illinois, LLC on 11/20/2018, filed by Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig) Modified on 11/30/2018 (JRB).
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WITHDRAWN BY #18 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Fresenius Medical Care Paris, LLC on 11/20/2018, filed by Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig) Modified on 11/30/2018 (JRB).
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WITHDRAWN BY #18 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Renal Care Group Terre Haute, LLC on 11/20/2018, filed by Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig) Modified on 11/30/2018 (JRB).
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. WITHDRAWN BY #18 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bio-Medical Applications of Indiana, Inc. on 11/20/2018, filed by Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig) Modified on 11/30/2018 (JRB).
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service for Summons Supplied by INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Morris McKee on behalf of Plaintiff INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (McKee, Craig)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5162942) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons, #3 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E)(McKee, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED v. BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Julia Chapman
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: George A. Gasper
Represented By: Judah Bellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF ILLINOIS, LLC
Represented By: Julia Chapman
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: George A. Gasper
Represented By: Judah Bellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE PARIS, LLC
Represented By: Julia Chapman
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: George A. Gasper
Represented By: Judah Bellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL GRAVES
Represented By: Julia Chapman
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: George A. Gasper
Represented By: Judah Bellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING, INC.
Represented By: Julia Chapman
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: George A. Gasper
Represented By: Judah Bellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF INDIANA, INC.
Represented By: Julia Chapman
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: George A. Gasper
Represented By: Judah Bellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE, INC.
Represented By: Julia Chapman
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: George A. Gasper
Represented By: Judah Bellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENAL CARE GROUP TERRE HAUTE, LLC
Represented By: Julia Chapman
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: George A. Gasper
Represented By: Judah Bellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE WABASH VALLEY
Represented By: Julia Chapman
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: George A. Gasper
Represented By: Judah Bellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNAL MEDICINE NEPHROLOGY, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Craig Morris McKee
Represented By: L. Pahl Zinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?