JACKSON v. MONK et al
Plaintiff: QUINTIN D. JACKSON
Defendant: ROBERT CARTER, HERITAGE TRAILS CORRECTIONAL, DANIEL L. CONN, CORIZON HEALTH, JULIA L. MONK, GRACE A. LEWIS, WEXFORD HEALTH, JAN DOE, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, ANN SCHLARB, DONALD EMERSON and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00171
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk to: 1) Julia L. Monk, and 2) Grace A. Lewis (DMW)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Entry Screening Amended Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - The claim which shall proceed is that Nurses Julia L. Monk and Grace A. Lewis were deliberately indifferent to Jackson's torn Achilles tendon in violation of the Eighth Amendment. If the plaintiff believes that additional claims were alleged in the complaint, but not identified by the Court, he shall have through July 10, 2019, in which to identify those claims. The clerk is directed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendants Julia L. Monk and Grace A. Lewis in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the amended complaint filed on May 1, 2019, (docket #5 ), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. The clerk is further directed to terminate defendants Wexford Health ("Wexford"), Corizon Health ("Corizon"), Daniel L. Conn (President of Wexford), Director of Nursing/President of GEO Care Ann Schlarb, Warden Donald Emerson, Grievance Specialists John/Jan Doe, correctional officer John/Jan Doe, Indiana Department of Correction ("IDOC"), Commissioner Robert Carter, and Heritage Trails Correctional Facility as defendants. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/13/2019. (DMW)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIPT #IP065293 for initial partial filing fee in the amount of $19.05, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #6 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Nineteen Dollars and Five Cents ($19.05). The plaintiff shall have through June 7, 2019, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/8/2019. (DMW)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff QUINTIN D. JACKSON. (MAT)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROBERT CARTER, DANIEL L. CONN, CORIZON HEALTH, JAN DOE, JOHN DOE, DONALD EMERSON, HERITAGE TRAILS CORRECTIONAL, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, GRACE A. LEWIS, JULIA L. MONK, ANN SCHLARB, WEXFORD HEALTH, filed by QUINTIN D. JACKSON.(MAT)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is denied as presented. He shall have until May 8, 2019, in which to renew his motion to proceed in forma pauperis by attaching a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action on April 10, 2019. Otherwise, the plaintiff must pay the $400.00 filing fee. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/16/2019. (DMW)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, QUINTIN D. JACKSON. (DJH)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT CARTER, DANIEL L. CONN, CORIZON HEALTH, JAN DOE, JOHN DOE, DONALD EMERSON, HERITAGE TRAILS CORRECTIONAL, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, GRACE A. LEWIS, JULIA L. MONK, ANN SCHLARB, WEXFORD HEALTH, filed by QUINTIN D. JACKSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. MONK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE TRAILS CORRECTIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL L. CONN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZON HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIA L. MONK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRACE A. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN SCHLARB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD EMERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUINTIN D. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?