GRIFFIN v. WATSON et al
Plaintiff: SIDNEY GRIFFIN
Defendant: USP-TERRE HAUTE/HEALTH SERVICES DIVISION AND UNKNOWN STAFF (DOCTORS) AND (PHYSICIANS ASSISTANTS), KRUGER, JOHN AND JANE DOES, J. DODGE, SHOEMAKER, JOHN O'BRIEN, UNDERWOOD, J. WATSON, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, A. SPRINGER, USP-TERRE HAUTE FOOD SERVICE AND UNKNOWN JOHN AND JANE DOES OF STATED:, H. HURWITZ and WILSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00184
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 RETURN of USM Service - JOHN O'BRIEN served on 6/27/2019. (DMW)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Denying Motion to Expedite - The plaintiff's motion to expedite pending motion for emergency temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, dkt. #7 , is denied as moot. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/24/2019. (DMW)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 Documents for service by USM - re #19 Summons Issued, #18 Entry, #17 Amended Complaint. Electronic notice to USM-C.(DMW)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to J. DODGE, H. HURWITZ, JOHN O'BRIEN, SHOEMAKER, UNDERWOOD, J. WATSON, WILSON. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Form US Attorney General, #2 USM 285 Form Office of the US Attorney, #3 USM 285 Form Shoemaker, #4 USM 285 Form Wilson, #5 USM 285 Form Watson, #6 USM 285 Form Underwood, #7 USM 285 Form Dodge, #8 USM 285 Form O'Brien, #9 USM 285 Form Hurwitz)(DMW)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff SIDNEY GRIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Entry Screening First Amended Complaint, Dismissing Insufficient Claims, and Directing Service - The clerk is directed, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c), to issue process to (1) Warden J. Watson; (2) Associate Warden Underwood; (3) Case Management Coordinator Shoemaker; (4) Case Manager Dodge; (5) Chief Designator John O'Brien; (6) Director H. Hurwitz; and (7) Dr. Wilson. Process shall consist of a summons. The Marshal for this District or his Deputy shall serve the summons, together with a copy of the first amended complaint (dkt. #17 ) and a copy of this Entry, on the defendants and on the officials designated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(2), at the expense of the United States. Mr. Griffin has filed multiple motions for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. See dkts. #9 , #14 . The defendants shall file a response to the plaintiff's motions when they file an answer. If Mr. Griffin believes that additional claims were alleged in the complaint, but not identified by the Court, he shall have through July 29, 2019, in which to identify those claims. The clerk is directed to terminate from the docket all defendants except Warden J. Watson, Associate Warden Underwood, Case Management Coordinator Shoemaker, Case Manager Dodge, Chief Designator John O'Brien, Director H. Hurwitz, and Dr. Wilson. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/20/2019. (DMW)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SIDNEY GRIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope)(DMW)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 Entry Granting Motion for Extension of Time and Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel - The plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file an amended complaint, dkt. #11 , is granted. The plaintiff shall have through July 24, 2019, to file an amended complaint. The plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel, dkt. #12 , is denied as premature. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/13/2019. (DMW)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 Supplement re #14 Emergency Letter/ MOTION, filed by Plaintiff SIDNEY GRIFFIN, and Non-Parties, Danny Nichols and Mikeal Stine. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 Emergency Letter/ MOTION, filed by Plaintiff SIDNEY GRIFFIN, and Non-Parties, Danny Nichols and Mikeal Stine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope)(DMW)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Entry Addressing Correspondence from Non-Party - On June 7, 2019, the Court received a letter from Mikeal Stine, and it was docketed as a motion for temporary restraining order. Dkt. #10 . Mr. Stine is not a party to this action and cannot represent others in district court. Consequently, the motion shall not be considered, and the clerk is directed to terminate the motion flag at docket #10 . Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/11/2019. (DMW)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed by Plaintiff SIDNEY GRIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(DMW)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff SIDNEY GRIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(DMW)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Non-Party, Mikeal Glenn Stine. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff SIDNEY GRIFFIN. Docketed per #8 Order. (DMW)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Entry Directing Further Proceedings - The clerk is directed to docket that motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, case no. 2:19-cv-00121-JPH-MJD, dkt. 2, in this case. On May 23, 2019, the plaintiff filed in this case a motion to expedite temporary restraining order. See dkt. #7 . Given the serious nature of the factual allegations as supplemented and amplified by this recent filing, the clerk is further directed to provide a courtesy copy of the newly re-docketed motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction and the motion to expedite temporary restraining order, dkt. #7 , to the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of Indiana and to counsel at the United States Penitentiary--Terre Haute. (See Entry.) Copies via U.S. Mail pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/31/2019. (DMW)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff SIDNEY GRIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint - The plaintiff shall have through June 24, 2019, in which to file an amended complaint identifying the defendants, facts, and legal bases for his cause of action. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/22/2019. (DMW)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #3 , is granted. No initial partial filing fee is due at this time. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 4/25/2019. (DMW)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff SIDNEY GRIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Inquiry, #2 Envelope)(DMW)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against J. DODGE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, H. HURWITZ, JOHN AND JANE DOES, KRUGER, JOHN O'BRIEN, SHOEMAKER, A. SPRINGER, UNDERWOOD, USP-TERRE HAUTE FOOD SERVICE AND UNKNOWN JOHN AND JANE DOES OF STATED:, USP-TERRE HAUTE/HEALTH SERVICES DIVISION AND UNKNOWN STAFF (DOCTORS) AND (PHYSICIANS ASSISTANTS), J. WATSON, filed by SIDNEY GRIFFIN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 Entry Severing Misjoined Plaintiffs into Separate Actions - The claims brought by Donald Nichols and Sidney Griffin are severed from the original complaint. After severance, the motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis shall be resolved and the complaint shall be screened. To effectuate this ruling two new civil actions from the Terre Haute Division shall be opened, consistent with the following: Sidney Griffin shall be the plaintiff in the second of the newly opened actions. The complaint in this action shall be filed and re- docketed as the complaint in the newly opened actions. A copy of this Entry shall be docketed in the newly opened actions. This action and the newly-opened actions shall be shown as linked actions. The defendants in the newly opened actions shall be the same as in this action. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sidney Griffin shall be docketed in the second opened action in which he is the named plaintiff. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 4/18/2019. (DMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIFFIN v. WATSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP-TERRE HAUTE/HEALTH SERVICES DIVISION AND UNKNOWN STAFF (DOCTORS) AND (PHYSICIANS ASSISTANTS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRUGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. DODGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNDERWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. SPRINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP-TERRE HAUTE FOOD SERVICE AND UNKNOWN JOHN AND JANE DOES OF STATED:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. HURWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIDNEY GRIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?