OFFILL v. KISOR
Plaintiff: JOEY LEE OFFILL
Defendant: M. JOSEPH KISOR
Case Number: 2:2019cv00223
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel, filed by Plaintiff JOEY LEE OFFILL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff JOEY LEE OFFILL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JOEY LEE OFFILL. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust Account, #2 Envelope)(DMW)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JOEY LEE OFFILL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The motion to proceed in forma pauperis could be denied because Offill has not demonstrated that he lacks the financial ability to pay the fee. The complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Although the complaint must be dismissed, Offill shall have through June 14, 2019, in which to show cause why Judgment consistent with this Order should not issue. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide Offill with the attached form affidavit. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(DMW)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JOEY LEE OFFILL. (REO)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M. JOSEPH KISOR, filed by JOEY LEE OFFILL. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OFFILL v. KISOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. JOSEPH KISOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEY LEE OFFILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?