BROWN v. WATSON

Petitioner: LEONARD BROWN
Respondent: T. J. WATSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00234
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, re #6 Order to Show Cause, filed by T. J. WATSON.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 Declaration D Sawyer with Attachments)(Langeneckert, Lara)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lara K. Langeneckert on behalf of Respondent T. J. WATSON. (Langeneckert, Lara)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by LEONARD BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The United States is notified of the filing of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and of the supporting memorandum. The respondent shall have until July 5, 2019, in which to answer the allegations of the habeas petition, and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. The petitioner shall have twenty-eight days after service of the answer in which to reply. (See Order.) Copy to Petitioner via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/28/2019. (DMW)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIPT #IP065195 for filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by Petitioner. (DJH)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Proceedings, filed by Petitioner LEONARD BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner LEONARD BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by LEONARD BROWN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits with Index, #2 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEONARD BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. J. WATSON
Represented By: Lara K. Langeneckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?