FRIEND v. WATSON
Petitioner: TRAVIS MCKINNLEY FRIEND
Respondent: T. J. WATSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00235
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Respondent shall have to and including October 3, 2019, to file his response to the 2241 petition. Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/5/2019. (DMW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 3, 2019 in which to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Respondent T. J. WATSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert Wood on behalf of Respondent T. J. WATSON. (Wood, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by TRAVIS MCKINNLEY FRIEND. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The United States is notified of the filing of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and of the supporting memorandum. The respondent shall have until July 5, 2019, in which to answer the allegations of the habeas petition, and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. The petitioner shall have twenty-eight days after service of the answer in which to reply. The petitioner shall have twenty-eight days, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. (See Order.) Copy to Petitioner via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/29/2019. (DMW)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TRAVIS MCKINNLEY FRIEND. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letters of Complaint from Vallia Friend to Virginia State Bar, #2 Exhibit 2 - Autopsy Report of Samuel Lam, #3 Affidavit of Travis Friend, #4 Affidavit of James Scruggs, #5 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRIEND v. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRAVIS MCKINNLEY FRIEND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. J. WATSON
Represented By: James Robert Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?